Global Patent Index - EP 0814540 B1

EP 0814540 B1 2002-09-11 - Terminal block

Title (en)

Terminal block

Title (de)

Anschlussleiste

Title (fr)

Bornier

Publication

EP 0814540 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97401227 A

Priority

FR 9607736 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0814540A1] The terminal (10) includes an insulating support (11) with a U-shaped cross-section presenting two lateral walls (14A,B) and lower base (16). The lateral walls present a number of equally spaced holes (15). The support cooperates with a brass connection strip (12-1,12-2) which can be fitted between the support arms. Corresponding lateral holes are provided in the strip from one side to the other. Each lateral hole in the connection strip has a transversal threaded hole engaged by a screw (21). The screw secures the extremity of a connection wire which has been inserted through the support and the strip holes. A number of colour coded lids (13-1,13-2) of different lengths are provided to cover the connections which can be grouped together.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 9/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 9/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 9/2475 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0814540 A1 19971229; EP 0814540 B1 20020911; CN 1110108 C 20030528; CN 1177218 A 19980325; DE 69715317 D1 20021017; DE 69715317 T2 20030102; ES 2184969 T3 20030416; FR 2750262 A1 19971226; FR 2750262 B1 19980904; TR 199700529 A2 19980121; TR 199700529 A3 19980121

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160604

2018-05-07 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20180507

2017-04-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170103

2017-01-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69715317

2016-01-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150603

2015-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150629

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150612

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-08-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140619

- Year of fee payment: 18

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090603

2010-02-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090603

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080605

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070630

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *LEGRAND FRANCE

- Effective date: 20070630

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *LEGRAND SNC

- Effective date: 20070630

2006-07-12 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20060712

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-09-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030612

2003-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2184969 T3

2002-11-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021023

2002-10-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69715317 20021017

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES GB IT

2002-09-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-10-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010912

1998-09-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE ES GB IT

1998-09-09 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES GB IT

1998-03-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980123

1997-12-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES GB IT