Global Patent Index - EP 0814541 B1

EP 0814541 B1 2002-11-20 - Electrical connector

Title (en)

Electrical connector

Title (de)

Elektrischer Verbinder

Title (fr)

Connecteur électrique

Publication

EP 0814541 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97401204 A

Priority

FR 9607630 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0814541A1] The connector includes a male box (1) cooperating with a female casing (2). The male box has a plastic body presenting a number of grooves (5), each groove cooperating with a female contact (6) hosed in the female casing. The box is provide with an elastic tongue (4) at one extremity and with connection blades (3) which receive an electrical conductor (14), at the opposite extremity. Each groove in the box has an opening (9) housing a contact blade (42). An elastic locking tongue (11) is provided for each groove. Each tongue presents a hook (12) cooperating with an opening (13) in the female contact. The female casing presents a number of corresponding grooves, each receiving a male contact (38). The case presents a protective projection (35).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/436

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/436 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/4362 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0814541 A1 19971229; EP 0814541 B1 20021120; DE 69717197 D1 20030102; DE 69717197 T2 20030508; ES 2184968 T3 20030416; FR 2750263 A1 19971226; FR 2750263 B1 19980724

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070530

2008-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070531

2008-08-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20070531

2008-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071201

2006-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060531

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-05-19 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20060519

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-05-10 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060510

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-11-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030821

2003-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2184968 T3

2003-01-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69717197 20030102

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT

2002-06-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020516

1998-04-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980213

1997-12-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT