Global Patent Index - EP 0814856 A4

EP 0814856 A4 2000-02-02 - EASY USE NEEDLE PROTECTOR SHEATH

Title (en)

EASY USE NEEDLE PROTECTOR SHEATH

Title (de)

NADELSCHUTZHÜLLE ZUM EINFACHEN GEBRAUCH

Title (fr)

GAINE PROTECTRICE D'AIGUILLE FACILE A UTILISER

Publication

EP 0814856 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 96945083 A

Priority

  • US 9620740 W
  • US 58445196 A
  • US 71495996 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9725082A1] A medical needle protector sheath (10) which comprises a body having a top wall (12), side walls (14, 16), an open first end (24), and slots (22) formed in each side wall to receive a needle wing extending through each of the slots. The slots extend from the first end toward a second sheath end (26) opposed to the first end, with the slots terminating in the side walls at end points which are spaced from the second end. Typically, first portions (40) of the slots adjacent to the end point slope away from the top wall as the slots extend toward the second end. Other portions (30) of the slots slope toward the top wall as the slots extend to the second end (26). Various improvements are described which result in safer and easier use of the needle protector sheath.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61M 5/00; A61M 5/32; A61M 25/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61M 5/32 (2006.01); A61M 25/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61M 25/0637 (2013.01); A61M 25/0631 (2013.01); A61M 5/3272 (2013.01); A61M 2005/3249 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9725082 A1 19970717; AU 1353697 A 19970801; AU 717410 B2 20000323; CA 2214989 A1 19970717; EP 0814856 A1 19980107; EP 0814856 A4 20000202; JP 3809563 B2 20060816; JP H11506036 A 19990602; MX 9706905 A 19980228

INPADOC legal status


2005-02-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040803

2002-09-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020801

2000-02-02 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 19991220

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

1999-11-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 6A 61M 5/00 A, 6A 61M 5/32 B, 6A 61M 25/06 B

1998-12-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DSU MEDICAL CORPORATION

1998-01-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970918

1998-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL