Global Patent Index - EP 0814924 B1

EP 0814924 B1 2000-11-08 - METHOD OF ENSURING SAND-MOULD QUALITY BY MEASURING THE RATE OF FLOW OF OIL TO THE HEAD OF A PRESS

Title (en)

METHOD OF ENSURING SAND-MOULD QUALITY BY MEASURING THE RATE OF FLOW OF OIL TO THE HEAD OF A PRESS

Title (de)

SANDFORMQUALITÄT DURCH ÖLSTROMMESSUNG ZUM PRESSHAUPT

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR ASSURER LA QUALITE DE MOULES EN SABLE PAR MESURE DU FLUX D'HUILE ENVOYE A LA PARTIE SUPERIEURE D'UNE PRESSE

Publication

EP 0814924 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96907251 A

Priority

  • DE 9600463 W
  • DE 19509211 A
  • DE 19540466 A
  • US 93767497 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US5980794A] The invention relates a control or regulation of a multipiston squeeze head or block squeeze head of a molding machine for clay-bonded molding sand (molding material). In an active pressing process with a squeeze head moving in downward direction, e. g. consisting of multislides or multipistons, the displacement of individual multislides has so far been detected through by end switches (approach switches) or through inductive stroke transducer. Thus, reached positions are registered and processed in a control means. Subject matter of the invention is an adaptation of influenceable parameters to obtain a sand mold of good quality on a long-term basis. Surprisingly, the measurement of the flown oil (Q;qt(t)) provides a basis for the improvement of the sand mold. If models of different sizes are molded subsequently, the quantity of sand required is different. According to the control signal of the invention (Q;qt(t)), more or less sand is filled into the bunker.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22C 15/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22C 15/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22C 15/08 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

US 5980794 A 19991109; AT 197418 T 20001111; CN 1063113 C 20010314; CN 1179120 A 19980415; DE 19540466 A1 19960919; DE 59606130 D1 20001214; DK 0814924 T3 20010212; EP 0814924 A1 19980107; EP 0814924 B1 20001108; ES 2153953 T3 20010316; WO 9629163 A1 19960926

INPADOC legal status


2016-03-15 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59606130

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150528

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150326

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-04-16 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: KUENKEL WAGNER GERMANY GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: KUENKEL-WAGNER PROZESSTECHNOLOGIE GMBH, 31061 ALFELD, DE

- Document: DE 59606130

- Effective date: 20150310

2015-04-16 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59606130

- Representative's name: LEONHARD & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20150310

2015-03-10 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59606130

- Representative's name: LEONHARD & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE, DE

2014-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130315

2009-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080317

2009-05-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20080317

2009-04-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2008-11-03 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2007-03-27 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20070327

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-03-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20070327

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-03-15 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050315

2004-03-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20040331

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-03-18 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20040318

- Year of fee payment: 9

2001-10-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: KUNKEL-WAGNER PROZESSTECHNOLOGIE G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20010331

2001-05-09 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20001108

2001-04-06 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-04-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2001-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010331

2001-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2153953 T3

2001-03-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KELLER & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE AG

2001-02-12 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2001-02-08 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010208

2001-02-08 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010208

2001-01-23 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: RACHELI & C. S.R.L.

2000-12-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59606130 20001214

2000-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

2000-11-08 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001108

2000-11-08 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001108

2000-11-08 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001108

2000-11-08 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001108

2000-11-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 197418 T 20001111

1998-06-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980508

1998-01-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971013

1998-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL PT SE