Global Patent Index - EP 0814929 B1

EP 0814929 B1 2001-05-02 - IMMERSED OUTLET FOR CASTING METAL

Title (en)

IMMERSED OUTLET FOR CASTING METAL

Title (de)

TAUCHAUSGUSS ZUM GIESSEN VON METALL

Title (fr)

BUSETTE IMMERGEE POUR COULER DU METAL

Publication

EP 0814929 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96904747 A

Priority

  • DE 9600405 W
  • DE 19512208 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19512208C1] The invention relates to an immersed outlet for casting metal, especially steel in continuous casting installations for thin slabs, with a run-in section (11) of circular cross section joined to a casting vessel and with an outlet (21) that dips into the melt in a rectangular chill and has an aperture of rectangular cross section. To provide an immersed casting pipe which is easy to make, has a long useful life and gives a uniform liquid metal flow, the invention proposes that the run-in section (11) take the form of a pipe with a uniform frontal aperture (12) and the outlet (21) be formed as uniform-surfaced wall components (22, 23). Here, the circular cross-sectional area (AR) of the run-in section (11) is in the relation AR/AE >/= 1.7 to the rectangular free cross section (AE) of the outlet section (21). The run-in section (11) is directly connected to the outlet (21) and their walls are of uniform thickness.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 41/50

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/10 (2006.01); B22D 41/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 41/50 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19512208 C1 19960718; AT 200870 T 20010515; AU 4874996 A 19961008; CN 1072079 C 20011003; CN 1178490 A 19980408; DE 19680152 D2 19980423; EP 0814929 A1 19980107; EP 0814929 B1 20010502; JP 3016596 B2 20000306; JP H10510216 A 19981006; RU 2145535 C1 20000220; TW 318803 B 19971101; US 5916472 A 19990629; WO 9629166 A1 19960926; ZA 9602272 B 19960930

INPADOC legal status


2015-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140304

2015-02-27 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140304

2015-01-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140304

2015-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141001

2015-01-15 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59606850

- Effective date: 20141001

2014-11-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140304

2014-11-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 200870 T

- Effective date: 20140304

2014-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59606850

2013-06-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20130313

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130321

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130321

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-09-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120329

- Year of fee payment: 17

2004-01-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-11-27 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031127

2002-04-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-03-15 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020315

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-07-20 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: GUZZI E RAVIZZA S.R.L.

2001-06-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59606850 20010607

2001-05-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010502

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT

2001-05-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 200870 T 20010515

2000-08-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991124

2000-02-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SMS DEMAG AG

1998-01-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970904

1998-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT