Global patent index - EP 0814993 B1

EP 0814993 B1 2000-05-03 - ELECTRIC VEHICLE, ESPECIALLY AN ELECTRICALLY POWERED RAIL VEHICLE, E.G. A LOW-PLATFORM TRAMCAR

Title (en)

ELECTRIC VEHICLE, ESPECIALLY AN ELECTRICALLY POWERED RAIL VEHICLE, E.G. A LOW-PLATFORM TRAMCAR

Title (de)

ELEKTROFAHRZEUG, INSBESONDERE ELEKTRISCH ANGETRIEBENES SCHIENENFAHRZEUG, ZUM BEISPIEL NIEDERFLURSTRASSENBAHN

Title (fr)

VEHICULE ELECTRIQUE, NOTAMMENT VEHICULE SUR RAILS A ENTRAINEMENT ELECTRIQUE, PAR EXEMPLE TRAMWAY A PLATE-FORME BASSE

Publication

EP 0814993 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96905585 A

Priority

  • AT 9600055 W
  • AT 51995 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9629224A1] The invention relates to an electric vehicle, especially an electrically powered rail vehicle (10), i.e. a low-platform tramcar, with at least one drivable wheel (2) of a bogie (7) fitted about a spindle (1) and an electric motor (3) in the region of said wheel (2) arranged in such a way that its rigid drive shaft (4) extends approximately parallel to the direction of travel. The drive shaft (4) is connected to the wheel (2) via a transmission (5) and an elastic coupling (8). This construction permits a high motor output with a low centre of gravity of the vehicle and reduced narrowing of the passage clearance inside the vehicle.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61C 9/52; B61D 13/00; B61F 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61C 9/52 (2006.01); B61D 13/00 (2006.01); B61F 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61C 9/52 (2013.01); B61D 13/00 (2013.01); B61F 3/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9629224 A1 19960926; AT 192391 T 20000515; AT 406569 B 20000626; AT A51995 A 19991115; DE 59605134 D1 20000608; EP 0814993 A1 19980107; EP 0814993 B1 20000503

INPADOC legal status

2015-02-27 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140321

2014-11-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM01

- Ref Document Number: 192391

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20140321

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131001

2014-01-16 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59605134

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20111001

2014-01-16 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59605134

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20131001

2013-06-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130212

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120518

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-12-12 [REG DE R409] INTERNAL RECTIFICATION OF THE LEGAL STATUS COMPLETED

- Ref Legal Event Code: R409

- Ref Document Number: 59605134

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2003-01-15 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27O

- Effective date: 20020823

2002-10-16 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: SIEMENS AG CT

- Effective date: 20010130

2001-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2001-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: ELIN EBG TRACTION G.M.B.H.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20010331

2001-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010331

2001-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010331

2001-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010331

2001-03-28 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: SIEMENS DUEWAG SCHIENENFAHRZEUGE GMBH

- Effective date: 20010130

2000-11-01 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20000503

2000-10-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2000-09-29 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2000-08-04 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000804

2000-08-03 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000803

2000-08-03 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000803

2000-06-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59605134

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-06-08

2000-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI NL PT SE

2000-05-03 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000503

2000-05-03 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000503

2000-05-03 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000503

2000-05-03 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000503

2000-05-03 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000503

2000-05-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 192391

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-05-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1999-04-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990225

1998-03-11 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: ELIN EBG TRACTION GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP3

1998-01-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970919

1998-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI NL PT SE