Global Patent Index - EP 0815120 B1

EP 0815120 B1 2001-02-14 - 17-DIFLUOROMETHYLENE-OESTRATRIENES

Title (en)

17-DIFLUOROMETHYLENE-OESTRATRIENES

Title (de)

17-DIFLUORMETHYLEN-ESTRATRIENE

Title (fr)

17-DIFLUOROMETHYLENE-OESTRATIENES

Publication

EP 0815120 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96907453 A

Priority

  • DE 19509729 A
  • EP 9601069 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19509729A1] The invention concerns novel 17-difluoromethylene-oestratrienes of general formula (I), in which: R<1> is a hydrogen atom or a C1-C10 alkyl group; R<5> is a methyl or ethyl group; R<2> is a hydrogen atom or an alpha - or beta -position C1-C10 alkyl group; R<3> is a hydrogen atom or C1-C10 alkyloxy group; R<4> is an alpha - or beta -position hydrogen atom; A, B, C, D, E and G each stand for a hydrogen atom; and optionnaly at least one of the substituent pairs G and R<2>, R<2> and R<4>, R<4> and A, A and R<3>, B and D, D and E represent a double bond. The novel compounds have antioxidant and vasculoprotective properties not previously noted in steroids and are suitable for use in the production of pharmaceutical preparations.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07J 13/00; A61K 31/56

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/56 (2006.01); A61K 31/02 (2006.01); A61K 31/35 (2006.01); A61K 31/352 (2006.01); A61K 31/435 (2006.01); A61K 31/47 (2006.01); A61K 31/505 (2006.01); A61K 31/565 (2006.01); A61K 31/70 (2006.01); A61K 31/7028 (2006.01); A61K 31/7034 (2006.01); A61K 31/7042 (2006.01); A61K 31/7048 (2006.01); A61P 7/00 (2006.01); A61P 9/00 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07D 311/10 (2006.01); C07D 401/04 (2006.01); C07D 487/04 (2006.01); C07D 491/14 (2006.01); C07D 493/04 (2006.01); C07D 513/04 (2006.01); C07H 15/203 (2006.01); C07H 15/26 (2006.01); C07H 17/04 (2006.01); C07J 13/00 (2006.01); C07K 5/06 (2006.01); C07K 5/062 (2006.01); C07K 5/068 (2006.01); C07K 5/072 (2006.01); C07K 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 401/04 (2013.01); A61K 31/02 (2013.01); C07D 487/04 (2013.01); C07H 15/203 (2013.01); C07J 13/007 (2013.01); C07K 9/001 (2013.01); Y10S 514/824 (2013.01); Y10S 514/825 (2013.01); Y10S 514/826 (2013.01); Y10S 514/866 (2013.01); Y10S 514/886 (2013.01); Y10S 514/899 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19509729 A1 19960919; AT 199159 T 20010215; AU 5107896 A 19961002; AU 693335 B2 19980625; BR 9612787 A 19991123; CA 2215201 A1 19960919; CZ 9702810 A3 19980218; EP 0815120 A1 19980107; EP 0815120 B1 20010214; HU 9801846 A2 19981228; HU 9801846 A3 19990301; IL 117497 A 19991222; IL 117497 D0 19960723; IS 4556 A 19970908; JP H11501644 A 19990209; MX 9707006 A 19971129; NO 308306 B1 20000828; NO 974206 A 19971113; NO 974206 D0 19970912; PL 322199 A1 19980119; RU 2155770 C2 20000910; SI 9620030 A 19980228; SK 121697 A3 19980204; TR 9700950 T1 19980221; US 6018062 A 20000125; US 6136800 A 20001024; WO 9628462 A1 19960919; ZA 9602037 B 19960925

INPADOC legal status


2015-05-13 [REG DE R107] PUBLICATION OF GRANT OF EUROPEAN PATENT RESCINDED

- Document: DE 59606435

- Effective date: 20150513

2001-11-14 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2001-06-15 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-03-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59606435 20010322

2001-03-21 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2001-03-14 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 20001227

2001-03-07 [DB1] DELETION OF B1 DOCUMENT

2001-02-28 [REG CH PK] CORRECTION

- Free text: BERICHTIGUNGEN

2001-02-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 19970908;LV PAYMENT 19970908

2001-02-14 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

2001-02-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 199159 T 20010215

1999-01-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981120

1998-01-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970908

1998-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-01-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 970908;LV PAYMENT 970908