Global patent index - EP 0815292 B1

EP 0815292 B1 2000-01-26 - PROCESS FOR THE SELECTIVE OR PARTIAL ELECTROLYTIC METALLIZATION OF SURFACES OF SUBSTRATES MADE FROM NON-CONDUCTING MATERIALS

Title (en)

PROCESS FOR THE SELECTIVE OR PARTIAL ELECTROLYTIC METALLIZATION OF SURFACES OF SUBSTRATES MADE FROM NON-CONDUCTING MATERIALS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM SELEKTIVEN ODER PARTIELLEN ELEKTROLYTISCHEN METALLISIEREN VON OBERFLÄCHEN VON SUBSTRATEN AUS NICHTLEITENDEN MATERIALIEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE METALLISATION ELECTROLYTIQUE SELECTIVE OU PARTIELLE DE SURFACES DE SUBSTRATS COMPOSES DE MATERIAUX NON CONDUCTEURS

Publication

EP 0815292 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96907505 A

Priority

  • DE 19510855 A
  • EP 9601190 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19510855A1] The invention concerns a process for the selective or partial electrolytic metallization of surfaces of substrates made from electrically non-conducting materials which for the purpose of the coating process are secured to plastic-coated holding elements. The proposed process involves the following steps: a) preliminary treatment of the surfaces with an etching solution containing chromium (VI) oxide; followed immediately by b) treatment of the surfaces with a colloidal acidic solution of palladium-/zinc compounds, care being taken to prevent prior contact with adsorption-promoting solutions; c) treatment of the surfaces with a solution containing a soluble metal compound capable of being reduced by zinc (II) compounds, an alkali or alkaline earth metal hydroxide, and a complex forming agent for the metal in a quantity sufficient at least to prevent precipitation of metal hydroxides; d) treatment of the surfaces with an electrolytic metallization solution. By applying this process, it is possible to ensure that only the surfaces of the work piece are coated with metal, not the holding elements or, where applicable, non-conductive plastic layers applied to parts of the work pieces. In addition, the process facilitates direct electrolytic metallization even of large plastic surfaces without prior currentless metallization.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C25D 5/54

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C25D 5/54 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C25D 5/54 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19510855 A1 19960919; DE 19510855 C2 19980430; AT 189274 T 20000215; BR 9607848 A 19980714; CA 2210883 A1 19960926; EP 0815292 A1 19980107; EP 0815292 B1 20000126; ES 2142572 T3 20000416; HK 1008552 A1 20000714; JP H11502263 A 19990223; WO 9629452 A1 19960926

INPADOC legal status

2003-07-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20021222

2003-07-01 [REG SE ECNC] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS BEEN CANCELLED

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ECNC

2003-05-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2003-05-14 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20021222

2003-05-14 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Free Format Text: 20021222

2002-03-08 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20020308

- Year of fee payment: 07

2002-02-25 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20020225

- Year of fee payment: 07

2002-02-21 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20020221

- Year of fee payment: 07

2002-02-20 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020220

- Year of fee payment: 07

2002-02-18 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20020218

- Year of fee payment: 07

2002-02-14 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20020214

- Year of fee payment: 07

2002-02-11 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020211

- Year of fee payment: 07

2002-02-07 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20020207

- Year of fee payment: 07

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-02-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: ENTHONE-OMI (DEUTSCHLAND) GMBH

2001-02-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: SHIPLEY COMPANY L.L.C.

2000-12-13 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: ENTHONE-OMI (DEUTSCHLAND) GMBH

- Effective date: 20001021

2000-12-13 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: SHIPLEY COMPANY L.L.C.

- Effective date: 20001024

2000-06-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-05-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000411

2000-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2142572

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2000-04-07 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. ZINI MARANESI & C. S.R.L.

2000-03-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59604301

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20000302

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2000-02-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: PATENTANWALTSBUERO JEAN HUNZIKER

2000-01-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-01-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 189274

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 20000215

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

1999-09-01 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: ATOTECH DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

1998-06-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980430

1998-03-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: JOSHI, NAYAN, H.

1998-03-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MC CASKIE, JOHN

1998-03-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MIDDEKE, HERMANN

1998-01-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970903

1998-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE