Global Patent Index - EP 0815303 B1

EP 0815303 B1 2000-05-24 - IMPROVED MACHINE FOR CONTINUOUSLY PLYING OR TWISTING YARNS WITH SUBSEQUENT COMPLEMENTARY HEAT TREATMENT

Title (en)

IMPROVED MACHINE FOR CONTINUOUSLY PLYING OR TWISTING YARNS WITH SUBSEQUENT COMPLEMENTARY HEAT TREATMENT

Title (de)

MASCHINE ZUM KONTINUIERLICHEN ZWIRNEN ODER KABLIEREN VON FÄDEN UND ANSCHLIESSEND ERGÄNZENDER WÄRMEBEHANDLUNG

Title (fr)

MACHINE PERFECTIONNEE PERMETTANT D'EFFECTUER, EN CONTINU, LE RETORDAGE OU LE CABLAGE DE FILS SUIVI D'UN TRAITEMENT THERMIQUE COMPLEMENTAIRE

Publication

EP 0815303 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96908156 A

Priority

  • FR 9600415 W
  • FR 9503746 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9630573A1] An improved machine for continuously plying or twisting yarns with subsequent complementary heat treatment is disclosed. Each position of the machine includes a spindle (1) supporting a yarn package (3) to be plied or twisted; yarn feed means (4); a heating means (8) followed by a cooling region; and rewinding means (13). Said heating means (8) consist of a vertical linear heating chamber in which the yarn (3) is drawn to the end of the chamber and back again by a system (10) provided therefor in the upper portion of the chamber, and means are provided for maintaining a minimum tension in the yarn (3) during cooling, and delivering it to the rewinding means (13).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01H 13/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01H 13/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01H 13/30 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9630573 A1 19961003; AT 193341 T 20000615; AU 5149996 A 19961016; DE 69608549 D1 20000629; DE 69608549 T2 20001012; EP 0815303 A1 19980107; EP 0815303 B1 20000524; ES 2146874 T3 20000816; FR 2732043 A1 19960927; FR 2732043 B1 19970425; TR 9701028 T1 19980121; US 5950412 A 19990914

INPADOC legal status


2014-09-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121002

2013-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120320

2013-02-07 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69608549

- Effective date: 20121002

2013-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120402

2013-01-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120331

2012-12-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20121130

2012-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: SWISSTEX FRANCE S.A.S.

- Effective date: 20120331

2012-01-13 [REG FR RM] CORRECTION OF A MATERIAL ERROR

- Effective date: 20111212

2011-11-25 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: SOCIETE SWISSTEX, FR

- Effective date: 20111024

2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100321

2011-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110331

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110404

2011-07-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110411

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-07-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20110324

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110310

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-04-19 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110419

2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100320

2010-11-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100320

2010-11-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100320

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090303

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-04-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20090218

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20090323

- Year of fee payment: 14

2007-12-31 [BECN] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S NAME

- Owner name: *RIETER TEXTILE MACHINERY FRANCE

- Effective date: 20051215

2007-06-08 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2005-12-02 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

2005-12-02 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-08-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2146874 T3

2000-08-02 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: SOCIETA' ITALIANA BREVETTI S.P.A.

2000-07-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000626

2000-06-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69608549 20000629

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT

2000-05-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 193341 T 20000615

1999-06-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ICBT YARN

1998-12-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981030

1998-01-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970728

1998-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT