Global patent index - EP 0815781 A3

EP 0815781 A3 2000-01-26 - Convertible cabinet

Title (en)

Convertible cabinet

Title (de)

Variables Schrankmöbel

Title (fr)

Armoire transformable

Publication

EP 0815781 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 97110970 A

Priority

  • DE 19627000 A
  • DE 19709266 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0815781A2] The wardrobe contains a hidden flexible mattress (1) on a flexible slatted grid (2) movable in a guide-piece which runs to one side near the rear of the main body (7) parallel to a wall, and curves forward in the bottom part of the wardrobe. The wardrobe has a forward moving frame (6) which, with the grid, is movable from an invisible position to a position for use in which the grid and frame form a bed. The slatted grid and mattress are positioned when not in use behind a rear wall of a wardrobe element (13). The grid consists of separate slats and two slide-link chains to the right and left hand sides in the guide pieces and fitted with mountings for the ends of the slats.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 17/58

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 85/08 (2006.01); A47C 17/58 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 17/58 (2013.01); A47B 85/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0815781 A2 19980107; EP 0815781 A3 20000126; DE 19627000 C1 19970703; DE 19709266 A1 19980108; DE 19709266 C2 19990520

INPADOC legal status

2001-05-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20000727

2000-11-09 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2000-10-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE