Global Patent Index - EP 0815929 B1

EP 0815929 B1 2000-08-30 - Static mixer

Title (en)

Static mixer

Title (de)

Statischer Mischer

Title (fr)

Mélangeur statique

Publication

EP 0815929 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96810441 A

Priority

EP 96810441 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0815929A1] A static mixer has a bundle of chambered passages (A,B,C.) which include at least some chambers which bring about a mixing effect. The bundle is located inside a tube, and the mixing chambers are arranged in a series extending in the direction of the axis of the tube, each chamber being bounded by two transverse end walls. Two adjacent side walls of the mixing chambers have four openings (a1, b1,a2,b2) arranged on alternate sides, which create connections with two upstream (A1,B1) and two downstream chambers (A2,B2). Between at least two sections of the mixer which contain mixing chambers, are placed transfer chambers (S1,S2,) which have two closed ends and three side openings to adjoining chambers.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01F 5/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01F 5/00 (2006.01); B01F 5/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01F 5/0617 (2013.01); B01F 5/0641 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0815929 A1 19980107; EP 0815929 B1 20000830; AT 195889 T 20000915; DE 59605822 D1 20001005; ES 2151650 T3 20010101; JP 4031556 B2 20080109; JP H1057791 A 19980303; US 5851067 A 19981222

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160704

2016-07-27 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20160704

2016-07-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-07-05 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59605822

2015-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150727

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-10-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20150721

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-10-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150721

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150721

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150626

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-06-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-02-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: DR. GRAF AND PARTNER AG INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY, CH

2014-02-28 [REG CH PCOW] CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF PATENT OWNER(S)

- Free text: NEW ADDRESS: SULZERALLEE 48, 8404 WINTERTHUR (CH)

2013-02-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110706

2012-11-22 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20121122

2010-10-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20100726

- Year of fee payment: 15

2008-08-29 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070731

2008-06-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070705

2008-06-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20060713

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-05-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070705

2008-04-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080201

2008-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070706

2008-04-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080201

2008-03-18 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2008-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SULZER CHEMTECH A.G.

- Effective date: 20070731

2006-08-22 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20060822

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-07-14 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20060714

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-07-14 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20060714

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-07-13 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20060713

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-01-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2151650 T3

2000-12-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-11-23 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. ZINI MARANESI & C. S.R.L.

2000-10-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59605822 20001005

2000-09-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000831

2000-09-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SULZER MANAGEMENT AG

2000-08-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-08-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 195889 T 20000915

2000-04-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000307

1998-11-11 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

1998-09-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

1998-09-16 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

1998-08-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980610

1998-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

1998-01-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: LT;LV;SI