Global Patent Index - EP 0816070 B1

EP 0816070 B1 2000-10-18 - A heat sensitive imaging element and a method for producing lithographic plates therewith

Title (en)

A heat sensitive imaging element and a method for producing lithographic plates therewith

Title (de)

Wärmeempfindliches Aufzeichnungselement und Verfahren zur Herstellung einer lithographischen Druckform damit

Title (fr)

Elément d'enregistrement thermosensible et méthode pour la fabrication d'un cliché lithographique utilisant cet élément

Publication

EP 0816070 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97201636 A

Priority

  • EP 97201636 A
  • EP 96201754 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0816070A1] According to the present invention there is provided a heat sensitive imaging element comprising on a hydrophilic surface of a lithographic base an image forming layer comprising at least hydrophobic thermoplastic polymer particles and a compound capable of converting light into heat, said compound being present in said image forming layer or a layer adjacent thereto, characterized in that onto said image forming layer is coated a covering layer having a thickness between 0.1 and 3 mu m.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41C 1/10; B41M 5/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41C 1/10 (2006.01); B41M 5/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41M 5/366 (2013.01); B41C 1/1025 (2013.01); B41C 2210/04 (2013.01); B41C 2210/06 (2013.01); B41C 2210/08 (2013.01); B41C 2210/24 (2013.01); B41C 2210/262 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0816070 A1 19980107; EP 0816070 B1 20001018

INPADOC legal status


2015-05-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140603

2015-05-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140630

2015-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150101

2015-03-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150227

2015-03-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69703316

- Effective date: 20150101

2015-02-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140603

2015-01-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69703316

2013-08-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130430

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130411

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130411

- Year of fee payment: 17

2008-12-12 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2007-04-04 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-01-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-11-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69703316 20001123

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB

2000-10-18 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001018

1998-11-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980928

1998-09-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE FR GB

1998-09-16 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB

1998-09-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980707

1998-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB