Global Patent Index - EP 0816098 B1

EP 0816098 B1 2002-09-18 - Keying system for ink supply containers

Title (en)

Keying system for ink supply containers

Title (de)

Kodierungsvorrichtung für Tintenzufuhrbehälter

Title (fr)

Dispositif de codage pour réservoirs d'alimentation en encre

Publication

EP 0816098 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97304273 A

Priority

US 67113496 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0816098A2] The present invention is an ink container (12) for supplying ink having proper ink parameters to an ink supply station (40). The ink container (12) includes a latch feature (22, 22') indicative of an ink parameter of a plurality of ink parameters. The latch feature (22, 22') being configured for engaging a supply station (40) latch surface (46) for securely mounting ink containers (12) having proper ink parameters in supply stations (40). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 2/175

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/175 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/1755 (2013.01); B41J 2/17513 (2013.01); B41J 2/1752 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0816098 A2 19980107; EP 0816098 A3 19981014; EP 0816098 B1 20020918; DE 69715529 D1 20021024; DE 69715529 T2 20030605; JP H1058701 A 19980303

INPADOC legal status


2017-06-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160618

2017-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160618

2017-04-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170103

2017-04-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160630

2017-03-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170228

2017-03-01 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160618

2017-01-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69715529

2015-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150529

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150526

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150521

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150527

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-05-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2012-04-25 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20120329 AND 20120404

2003-09-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030619

2003-02-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-10-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69715529 20021024

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-09-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2001-03-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: HEWLETT-PACKARD COMPANY, A DELAWARE CORPORATION

2000-12-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001019

1999-06-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

1999-05-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990319

1998-10-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-02-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: STEINMETZ, CHARLES R.

1998-02-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: GONZALES, CURT G.

1998-02-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: WILSON, JOHN F.

1998-02-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HMELAR, SUSAN

1998-02-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MERRILL, DAVID O.

1998-02-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SCHMIDT, GLEN E.

1998-02-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: UNDERWOOD, JOHN A.

1998-02-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: GREEN, MARK J.

1998-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT