Global Patent Index - EP 0816106 A3

EP 0816106 A3 2000-08-30 - Label printer with different display modes

Title (en)

Label printer with different display modes

Title (de)

Etikettendrucker mit unterschiedlichen Anzeigemoden

Title (fr)

Imprimante pour étiquettes avec modes d'affichage différents

Publication

EP 0816106 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 97110020 A

Priority

GB 9614142 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0816106A2] The label printed has and input with a number of keys for defining a label image to be printed, These keys include keys for defining the format of a label. A display is included for displaying and image, and a printing unit to produce the label. The label printer is controlled by a control unit to operate in layout mode, in which mode the display is caused to display an image of the label having the selected label format, and a number of layout parameters for defining the format Each parameter is alterable, where the label shown on the display alters with each selected alteration of the layout parameters by actuation of the format keys. The input unit includes keys for defining attributes of with input characters, and the control unit is arranged to control the label printer to operate in a character mode in which the display is caused by the control unit to show a characters with the selected character attributes and a number of character attribute parameters for defining the attributes. Each parameter is alterable, where the character shown on the display alters with each selected alteration of the character attribute parameter by actuation of the attribute keys.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 17/21; G06F 3/023; G06K 15/02; B41J 3/407

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 3/407 (2006.01); B65C 11/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 3/4075 (2013.01); B65C 11/0289 (2013.01); B65C 2210/0018 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0816106 A2 19980107; EP 0816106 A3 20000830; EP 0816106 B1 20061025; DE 59712754 D1 20061207; GB 2314955 A 19980114; GB 9614142 D0 19960904; US 5885012 A 19990323

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170103

2017-04-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160630

2017-03-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170228

2017-03-01 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160619

2017-01-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59712754

2015-11-27 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59712754

- Representative's name: PAGE WHITE & FARRER, GB

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150617

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150629

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150629

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-06-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2007-10-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070726

2007-05-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-12-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59712754 P 20061207

2006-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2006-10-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-01-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DYMO

2004-04-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ESSELTE

2001-08-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010703

2001-05-23 [R17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20010214

2001-05-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2001-05-16 [D17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (DELETED)

2001-05-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010214

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 06F 17/21 A, 7G 06F 3/023 B, 7G 06K 15/02 B, 7B 41J 3/407 B

1998-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB