Global Patent Index - EP 0816121 B1

EP 0816121 B1 2000-03-15 - AUTOMATIC MARKER FOR BOOKS, AGENDAS AND THE LIKE, AND FABRICATION PROCESS

Title (en)

AUTOMATIC MARKER FOR BOOKS, AGENDAS AND THE LIKE, AND FABRICATION PROCESS

Title (de)

BLATTWEISER FÜR BÜCHER, AGENDEN UND ÄHNLICHES UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG

Title (fr)

MARQUEUR AUTOMATIQUE POUR LIVRES, AGENDAS ET AUTRES ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION

Publication

EP 0816121 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96939940 A

Priority

  • ES 9600221 W
  • ES 9502976 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9718955A1] Automatic marker for books, agendas and the like, appropriate for signalling the last page read/written by the user and comprised of three parts: an indicator segment (1); a fixing element (2) fixed to one of the covers, pages or spine and a union means or flexion arm (3) between said segment (1) and said element (2). Said parts (1, 2, 3) are conformed into a single piece (20), the indicator segment (1) and flexion arm (3) being obtained by a cut/separation through weakening-precut lines of one area of said part (20) with fixing points which are separable when using the marker. The remainder of the part (20) forms the fixing part (2), used as support which is fixed interleaved between the pages of the assembly, one edge bearing on the spine and remains fixed due to the pressure of the pages. It includes a stop (9) for an adequate positioning of its top edge.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B42D 9/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B42D 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B42D 9/005 (2013.01); B42D 9/001 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9718955 A1 19970529; AU 2612197 A 19970611; DE 69607152 D1 20000420; DE 69607152 T2 20001214; EP 0816121 A1 19980107; EP 0816121 B1 20000315; ES 1033621 U 19961001; ES 1033621 Y 19970416; ES 2146032 T3 20000716

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151122

2016-12-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20161227

2015-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141201

2015-10-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141121

2015-08-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150731

2015-07-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20141121

2015-01-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20141125

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-02-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20131127

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20131125

- Year of fee payment: 18

2005-11-21 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051121

2004-06-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040602

2004-05-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *MESTRES ARMENGOL FERNANDO

- Effective date: 20031130

2004-05-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *LOPEZ FERNANDEZ FRANCISCO

- Effective date: 20031130

2003-11-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031130

2002-12-23 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20021223

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-11-22 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20021122

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-02-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-07-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2146032 T3

2000-06-13 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MARIETTI E GISLON S.R.L.

2000-04-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69607152 20000420

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT

1998-12-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981104

1998-01-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970821

1998-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT