Global Patent Index - EP 0816222 B1

EP 0816222 B1 2002-12-18 - Watercraft propulsion unit

Title (en)

Watercraft propulsion unit

Title (de)

Antriebseinheit für Wasserfahrzeuge

Title (fr)

Unité de propulsion pour bateaux

Publication

EP 0816222 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97110587 A

Priority

  • JP 18815296 A
  • JP 18815396 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0816222A2] A watercraft propulsion unit (4) comprises a bracket (6) mountable to a hull (2), a motor drive unit (8) mounted to the lower end of the bracket (6) and locatable in the body of water (7) and having an electric motor (23) provided with a motor case (27) for driving a propeller (24). Said motor drive unit (8) comprises a casing (16) forming an outer shell thereof and mounted to said bracket (6), and said electric motor (23) is accommodated in said casing (16) and mounted thereto.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B63H 20/06; B63H 23/24; H02K 5/132; H02K 5/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B63H 20/00 (2006.01); B63H 23/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B63H 23/24 (2013.01); B63H 20/007 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GR IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0816222 A2 19980107; EP 0816222 A3 19990210; EP 0816222 B1 20021218; DE 69717914 D1 20030130; DE 69717914 T2 20030430

INPADOC legal status


2005-04-08 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-03-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050101

2005-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050228

2005-02-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-01-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050101

2005-01-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050101

2004-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2003-12-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030919

2003-07-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-07-10 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030710

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-07-02 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20030702

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-06-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20030630

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-06-10 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030610

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-03-18 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030318

2003-01-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWALTSBUERO JEAN HUNZIKER

2003-01-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69717914 20030130

2003-01-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69717914 P 20030130

2002-12-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GR IT LI NL SE

2002-12-18 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021218

2002-12-18 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021218

2002-07-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: KABUSHIKI KAISHA MORIC

2001-04-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010226

1999-10-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GR IT LI NL SE

1999-10-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990805

1999-02-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GR IT LI NL SE