Global Patent Index - EP 0816235 B1

EP 0816235 B1 2000-04-19 - Apparatus for packaging objects

Title (en)

Apparatus for packaging objects

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Verpacken von Gegenständen

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'emballage d'articles

Publication

EP 0816235 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97110911 A

Priority

DE 19626665 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0816235A1] The device has a feed position (2) where the objects are delivered either singly or in packs and a station (5) for preparing and/or opening the packing. There is another station(6) to seal up the filled packing and a slider (12) to transport the objects from the feed position into the opened packing and together with this as far as the second station. There is at least one rail (4), and preferably a pair of rails, running in the transport direction of the slider, on which at least the above two stations are fixed, at least one of them being adjustable in position along the rail(s).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 59/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 5/04 (2006.01); B65B 59/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 59/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0816235 A1 19980107; EP 0816235 B1 20000419; DE 19626665 A1 19980108; JP H1059303 A 19980303; US 5950404 A 19990914

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160721

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160722

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160721

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160722

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160728

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 20

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-04-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-07-19 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000719

2000-07-12 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MODIANO & ASSOCIATI S.R.L.

2000-07-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-06-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000522

2000-05-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59701461 20000525

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT SE

1998-10-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980915

1998-09-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE FR GB IT SE

1998-09-16 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT SE

1998-08-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980616

1998-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT SE