Global patent index - EP 0816277 B1

EP 0816277 B1 2000-03-29 - Method of and device for making random cross-wound bobbins

Title (en)

Method of and device for making random cross-wound bobbins

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Herstellen von Kreuzspulen in wilder Wicklung

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour fabriquer des bobines à spires croisées au hasard

Publication

EP 0816277 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97108839 A

Priority

DE 19625511 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0816277A2] A method for producing crossover reels with random winding entails winding a yarn coating on an initially empty core to form a reel where the apparatus used throughout the winding sequence includes a friction roller to drive the reel and means for sensing and evaluating reel and roller angular speeds so that the current coating size ( delta i) is continuously determined during the winding procedure. Also claimed is the apparatus used in the method as above and including the roller and reel speed sensors and coating thickness evaluating units (27, 28, 29). Preferably determination of current coating thickness is given by a mathematical filter developed from an equation (2a, 2b) giving instantaneous reel diameter (dsp) versus winding time or versus number of reel rotations, current thickness being demonstrated by a curve over time or reel diameter. The diameter is formed from the current coating values and compared to a limit corresponding to maximum diameter, winding being stopped when the limit is reached. Current values are compared to preset values at least in ribbon formation zones and set to the preset values. The evaluation unit includes the mathematical filter (29) yielding the reel (13') diameter, the comparator (31) which sends the signal to stop winding and units (32, 34) for displaying indicating the trend of coating thickness ( delta ). A second comparator (35) sends adjusting signals when actual and preset thicknesses deviate.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 54/38; B65H 63/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 63/08 (2006.01); B65H 54/38 (2006.01); B65H 63/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 54/38 (2013.01); B65H 63/00 (2013.01); B65H 2515/12 (2013.01); B65H 2557/24 (2013.01); B65H 2701/31 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19625511 A1 19980102; CN 1170691 A 19980121; EP 0816277 A2 19980107; EP 0816277 A3 19980826; EP 0816277 B1 20000329; JP H1072168 A 19980317; TR 9700526 A2 19980121; TR 9700526 A3 19980121; US 6302349 B1 20011016

INPADOC legal status

2005-06-03 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050603

2005-01-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050101

2004-04-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2004-02-27 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040227

2004-02-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2003-09-11 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030911

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030630

2002-06-25 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020625

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-06-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020619

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-03-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-05-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59701349

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-05-04

2000-04-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-03-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI

1999-11-30 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

1999-07-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990518

1999-05-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE FR IT LI

1999-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI

1999-04-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990226

1998-08-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI