Global Patent Index - EP 0816306 B1

EP 0816306 B1 2000-03-15 - Propellants with a high specific impulsion, containing furazane derivatives

Title (en)

Propellants with a high specific impulsion, containing furazane derivatives

Title (de)

Propergole mit hohem spezifischem Impuls, die Furazanderivative enthalten

Title (fr)

Propergols à forte impulsion spécifique comportant des dérivés du furazane

Publication

EP 0816306 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97401484 A

Priority

FR 9608051 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0816306A1] Propergols containing furazane derivatives with high specific impulse are claimed. They contain a binder, some additives and an energetic feed chosen from dinitro bifurazane consisting of 3,3'-azoxybis Ä4 nitrofurazaneÜ C4N8O7, 3,3'-azobis Ä4 nitrofurazaneÜ C4N8O6 and, 3,3' bis Ä4 nitrofurazaneÜ C4N6O6. They also contain 10 wt.% of a pulverulent metallic feed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C06B 25/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C06B 25/34 (2006.01); C06B 45/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C06B 45/105 (2013.01); C06B 25/34 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0816306 A1 19980107; EP 0816306 B1 20000315; DE 69701422 D1 20000420; DE 69701422 T2 20000907; FR 2750421 A1 19980102; FR 2750421 B1 19980807; US 5747729 A 19980505

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150626

2016-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160101

2016-02-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150627

2016-02-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150626

2016-02-02 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2016-01-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150626

2016-01-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69701422

2014-08-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20140526

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140523

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-08-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140530

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140527

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-07-04 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: HERAKLES, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SNPE MATERIAUX ENERGETIQUES, PARIS, FR

- Document: DE 69701422

- Effective date: 20130513

2013-07-04 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: HERAKLES, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SME, PARIS, FR

- Document: DE 69701422

- Effective date: 20130528

2013-07-04 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69701422

- Representative's name: CBDL PATENTANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20130513

2013-07-04 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69701422

- Representative's name: CBDL PATENTANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20130528

2013-05-13 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69701422

- Representative's name: CBDL PATENTANWAELTE, DE

2004-08-25 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-02-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-05-09 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2000-05-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000410

2000-04-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69701422 20000420

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT SE

1999-12-29 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: PROPELLANTS WITH A HIGH SPECIFIC IMPULSION, CONTAINING FURAZANE DERIVATIVES

1999-08-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990709

1998-09-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE GB IT SE

1998-09-16 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT SE

1998-09-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980707

1998-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT SE