Global Patent Index - EP 0816473 B1

EP 0816473 B1 2002-09-25 - Use of non-carcinogenic bright stock extracts in printing oils

Title (en)

Use of non-carcinogenic bright stock extracts in printing oils

Title (de)

Verwendung von nicht-krebserregenden Brightstock-Extrakte in Drucktinte

Title (fr)

Application d'extraits de bright stock dans les encres d'imprimerie

Publication

EP 0816473 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97116529 A

Priority

EP 92903220 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0816473A1] Non-carcinogenic bright stock extracts and/or deasphalted oils from reduced hydrocarbon feedstocks. Such non-carcinogenic bright stock extracts and/or deasphalted oils is accomplished by establishing a functional relationship between mutagenicity index and a distillation characteristic of said product stream, which when achieved, results in the product having a mutagenicity index of less than 1.0. Process conditions are established so that a product stream achieving the desired distillation parameter can be produced. Non-carcinogenic bright stock extracts and/or deasphalted oils are then processed utilising the conditions so established.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10G 21/00; C10C 3/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10G 21/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10G 21/003 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE DK FR GB IT LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0816473 A1 19980107; EP 0816473 B1 20020925

INPADOC legal status


2011-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090626

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090625

2010-07-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100101

2010-06-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090625

2010-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100101

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090625

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080424

- Year of fee payment: 18

2010-03-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100226

2010-03-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100101

2010-02-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090625

2009-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *EXXONMOBIL OIL CORP.

- Effective date: 20090630

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080506

- Year of fee payment: 18

2008-11-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080628

- Year of fee payment: 18

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080630

- Year of fee payment: 18

2008-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20080530

- Year of fee payment: 18

2008-10-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20080609

- Year of fee payment: 18

2008-09-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20080630

- Year of fee payment: 18

2008-08-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20080507

- Year of fee payment: 18

2003-09-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030626

2003-06-25 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030625

2002-12-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021209

2002-12-25 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021225

2002-12-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-10-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69133121 20021031

2002-09-25 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 591218

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK FR GB IT LU NL SE

2002-09-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-09-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 224941 T 20021015

2002-02-27 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: USE OF NON-CARCINOGENIC BRIGHT STOCK EXTRACTS IN PRINTING OILS

2001-10-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: EXXONMOBIL OIL CORPORATION

1999-06-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990429

1998-09-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980716

1998-01-07 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 591218

1998-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK FR GB IT LU NL SE