Global Patent Index - EP 0816515 B1

EP 0816515 B1 2002-09-25 - Cooling plate for metallurgical furnaces of the iron and steel industry

Title (en)

Cooling plate for metallurgical furnaces of the iron and steel industry

Title (de)

Kühlplatte für metallurgische Öfen der Eisen- und Stahlindustrie

Title (fr)

Plaque de refroidissement pour fours métallurgiques de l'industrie sidérurgique

Publication

EP 0816515 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97110960 A

Priority

DE 29611704 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: CA2209682A1] The invention pertains to a plate cooler for blast furnaces, direct reduction reactors and gassing units provided with a refractory lining, as used in the iron and steel industry, said cooler consisting of cast copper or a low-alloyed copper alloy with coolant ducts arranged in its interior. Prefabricated coolant ducts consisting either of copper pipe attachmentsections (2), copper pipelines (3) and copper pipe bends (4) or of bent copper pipes, are integrally cast in the plate cooler (1). The wall (5) of the plate cooler ( 1 ) facing the interior of the furnace is provided with webs (7) and grooves (8) or has a flat surface (9). The plate cooler (1) may be provided with bilateral vertical and/or bilateral horizontal side flanges.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C21B 7/10; F27D 1/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C21B 7/10 (2006.01); F27D 1/12 (2006.01); F27B 1/24 (2006.01); F27D 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F27D 1/12 (2013.01); C21B 7/10 (2013.01); F27B 1/24 (2013.01); F27D 2009/0048 (2013.01); F27D 2009/0051 (2013.01); F27D 2009/0062 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI FR GB IT LU NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 29611704 U1 19961017; CA 2209682 A1 19980105; EP 0816515 A1 19980107; EP 0816515 B1 20020925; JP 3045086 U 19980123; US 5904893 A 19990518

INPADOC legal status


2006-05-12 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-04-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060201

2006-03-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050702

2006-02-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060201

2006-02-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060201

2005-07-10 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050710

2005-07-02 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050702

2005-07-02 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050702

2005-07-02 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050702

2005-01-24 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20050124

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-01-11 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20050111

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-01-11 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050111

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-01-10 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20050110

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-01-06 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050106

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-12-23 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20041223

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-09-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030626

2003-02-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030128

2003-01-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-10-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59708301 20021031

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB IT LU NL

2002-09-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2000-08-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000718

2000-07-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SMS SCHLOEMANN-SIEMAG AG

2000-07-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: HUNDT & WEBER GMBH

1998-09-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FI FR GB IT LU NL

1998-09-16 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB IT LU NL

1998-04-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980124

1998-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB IT LU NL