Global patent index - EP 0816545 B1

EP 0816545 B1 2000-02-02 - Defective weft insertion detection device on a gripper loom

Title (en)

Defective weft insertion detection device on a gripper loom

Title (de)

Vorrichtung an einer Greiferwebmaschine zum Erkennen eines fehlerhaften Schussfadeneintrages

Title (fr)

Dispositif de détection d'une insertion de trame défecteueuse sur un métier à tisser à griffes

Publication

EP 0816545 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96810439 A

Priority

EP 96810439 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0816545A1] An apparatus for detecting a defective weft thread insertion in a rapier loom (1) having a rapier head (2) and thread feeds (7a, 7b, 7c) comprises at least two sensors (5a, 5b). The first sensor (5b) is placed to monitor an introduced weft thread (8c) which runs between an introducing feed (7c) and the rapier head. The second sensor (5a) is placed so that it can detect an undesirably inserted weft thread (8b) running between a thread feed (7a, 7b) located in a stand-by position and the rapier head. Also claimed is a rapier loom having the above apparatus.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D03D 47/38; D03D 47/34; D03D 51/44

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D03D 47/34 (2006.01); D03D 47/38 (2006.01); D03D 51/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03D 47/38 (2013.01); D03D 47/34 (2013.01); D03D 51/34 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0816545 A1 19980107; EP 0816545 B1 20000202; DE 59604371 D1 20000309

INPADOC legal status

2011-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100731

2011-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100703

2011-05-19 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59604371

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110201

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110201

2011-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SULZER TEXTIL A.G.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20100731

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090725

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-02-26 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090818

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090722

- Year of fee payment: 14

2001-01-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-04-20 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. ZINI MARANESI & C. S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-03-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59604371

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-03-09

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE IT

1999-08-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SULZER TEXTIL AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1999-04-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990224

1998-09-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: BE DE IT

1998-09-16 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): BE DE IT

1998-08-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980610

1998-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE IT

1998-01-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: LT;LV;SI