Global Patent Index - EP 0816584 B1

EP 0816584 B1 2000-05-10 - Screwed coupler for load transmitting bars

Title (en)

Screwed coupler for load transmitting bars

Title (de)

Schraubkupplung für kraftübertragende Stäbe

Title (fr)

Manchon faraudé pour barres de transmission de force

Publication

EP 0816584 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97110267 A

Priority

DE 19626649 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0816584A1] The coupling has a sleeve (3) which is connected to a first end (1) of a bar, and which has an internal thread. It also has a connecting head (7), which is joined to a second end of a bar, and which has a threaded spigot (8) which can be screwed into the sleeve. An element (6,9) which can be deformed by an axial force is arranged between the spigot and the first bar end. The depth to which the spigot can be screwed in is limited by a stop surface (12) on the sleeve, or by a mark on the connecting head.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04C 5/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04C 5/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04C 5/165 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0816584 A1 19980107; EP 0816584 B1 20000510; AT 192815 T 20000515; DE 19626649 A1 19980108; DK 0816584 T3 20000911; ES 2147958 T3 20001001

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150630

2016-11-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150625

2016-08-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150630

2016-07-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20160728

2016-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150630

2016-05-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150624

2016-04-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150630

2016-04-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150624

2016-04-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150630

2016-04-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150701

2016-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160101

2016-04-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160229

2016-03-02 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150701

2016-02-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150625

2016-02-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150624

2016-02-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 192815 T

- Effective date: 20150624

2016-02-02 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2016-01-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150624

2016-01-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-01-25 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20150630

2016-01-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59701624

2014-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140619

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-10-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20140620

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-09-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20140618

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-08-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20140618

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-08-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20140618

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-08-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140627

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-08-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20140627

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-08-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20140618

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-08-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20140611

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140619

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140618

- Year of fee payment: 18

2008-09-01 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: HALFEN GMBH

2008-08-29 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2008-08-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: HALFEN GMBH & CO. KOMMANDITGESELLSCHAFT

- Effective date: 20080521

2008-02-29 [BECH] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER

- Owner name: HALFEN G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20080207

2008-02-29 [REG CH PK] CORRECTION

2007-12-31 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: HALFEN GMBH & CO. KOMMANDITGESELLSCHAFT

- Free text: DEHA ANKERSYSTEME GMBH & CO. KG#BRESLAUER STRASSE 3#64521 GROSS-GERAU (DE) -TRANSFER TO- HALFEN GMBH & CO. KOMMANDITGESELLSCHAFT#LIEBIGSTRASSE 14#40764 LANGENFELD (DE)

2007-12-31 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: HALFEN GMBH

- Free text: HALFEN GMBH & CO. KOMMANDITGESELLSCHAFT#LIEBIGSTRASSE 14#40764 LANGENFELD (DE) -TRANSFER TO- HALFEN GMBH#LIEBIGSTRASSE 14#40764 LANGENFELD (DE)

2007-11-07 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2007-10-31 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2007-09-28 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG;POSTFACH 1772;8027 ZUERICH (CH)

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-10-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2147958 T3

2000-09-11 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2000-09-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-08-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000725

2000-06-20 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO TORTA S.R.L.

2000-06-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2000-06-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59701624 20000615

2000-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-05-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 192815 T 20000515

1999-11-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991011

1998-09-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

1998-09-16 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

1998-07-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980527

1998-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE