Global Patent Index - EP 0816591 A3

EP 0816591 A3 2000-08-23 - False floor

Title (en)

False floor

Title (de)

Hohlraumboden

Title (fr)

Faux plancher

Publication

EP 0816591 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 97110872 A

Priority

DE 19626570 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19626570C1] The plates (1) are preferably square, and laid on an underfloor in a set pattern so as to leave spaces for pipes, wiring etc. At one edge, each plate has a step (2) at one side, and at the other three steps (3) at the opposite side. The plates are laid in lines (4a-c), the first step (2) on each being always at right angles to the line. The plates in one line (4a,4c) fit by their bottom protruding steps under the top ones of the plates in the adjacent lines (4b,4d), and also support the top steps (2) on the plates in the same lines. The plates can be of fibre-board.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04F 15/024

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04F 15/024 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04F 15/02405 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19626570 C1 19970821; EP 0816591 A2 19980107; EP 0816591 A3 20000823

INPADOC legal status


2001-10-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010226

2001-06-13 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-05-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-17 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: SICOWA VERFAHRENSTECHNIK FUER BAUSTOFFE GMBH & CO.

2000-05-17 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: PROMINERAL GESELLSCHAFT ZUR VERWENDUNG VON MINERA

1998-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE