Global Patent Index - EP 0816599 A3

EP 0816599 A3 2000-09-06 - Device for remote control of a garage door

Title (en)

Device for remote control of a garage door

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Fernsteuerung eines Garagentores

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour la commande à distance d'une porte de garage

Publication

EP 0816599 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 97107894 A

Priority

DE 19625998 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0816599A2] The apparatus has at least one transmitter and at least one receiver on the garage door side. The receiver gathers the remote control signals from the transmitter, and controls a drive of the garage door in dependence on the control signals. The receiver (4) has a switch (28) connected to the garage door drive (6). The signals from the transmitter (3) are encoded with a rolling code using an RSA process. The connection between the receiver and the transmitter may be bidirectional or unidirectional. An antenna signal of the transmitter (3) or the receiver (4) may be mixed with a local oscillator frequency. An antenna of the transmitter (3) or the receiver (4), and an oscillator, (14) may be connected to a mixer (13).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 49/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07C 9/00 (2006.01); G08C 17/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08C 17/02 (2013.01); G07C 9/00309 (2013.01); G07C 9/00714 (2013.01); G07C 2009/0023 (2013.01); G07C 2009/00253 (2013.01); G07C 2009/00412 (2013.01); G07C 2009/00492 (2013.01); G07C 2009/00793 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT LU

EPO simple patent family

DE 19625998 A1 19980102; EP 0816599 A2 19980107; EP 0816599 A3 20000906; EP 0816599 B1 20040128

INPADOC legal status


2008-08-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060531

2008-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070531

2008-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070515

2008-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071201

2008-03-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080131

2008-01-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070515

2006-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060531

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-04-06 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060406

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-05-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050517

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-01-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041029

2004-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SCHEFENACKER VISION SYSTEMS GERMANY G.M.B.H. & CO

- Effective date: 20040531

2004-10-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040531

2004-05-15 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040515

2004-05-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040416

2004-05-09 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040509

2004-03-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59711249 P 20040304

2004-01-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT LU

2004-01-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-01-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040128

2003-11-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHEFENACKER VISION SYSTEMS GERMANY GMBH & CO.

2003-01-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021213

2001-02-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001219

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT LU

1998-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT LU