Global Patent Index - EP 0816641 A3

EP 0816641 A3 2000-05-24 - Process and system for improving efficiency of steam generators

Title (en)

Process and system for improving efficiency of steam generators

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Wirkungsgradverbesserung in Dampfkraftwerken

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour l'amélioration du rendement dans les générateurs de vapeur

Publication

EP 0816641 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 97110651 A

Priority

DE 19626372 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0816641A2] The part condensers on the cooling water side are connected in series in a main cooler. All the cooling water conduits leaving the part condensers (3a,3b) have further cooling water conducting conduits connected to them before entering following part condensers. The connected conduits conducting cooling water are all or partly branched onto the main cooling water conduit (2) leaving the cooling water pump before entry into the main condenser unit (3). A heat transmission system (4) comprises an ancillary cooling water system.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01K 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01K 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01K 9/003 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19626372 C1 19971127; EP 0816641 A2 19980107; EP 0816641 A3 20000524

INPADOC legal status


2003-08-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030201

2002-05-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020404

2001-05-02 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2001-03-08 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-01-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-07-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000509

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB