Global Patent Index - EP 0816661 B1

EP 0816661 B1 2002-11-13 - Cylinder head for internal combustion engine

Title (en)

Cylinder head for internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Zylinderkopf für eine Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Culasse pour moteur à combustion

Publication

EP 0816661 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97110112 A

Priority

DE 19627371 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0816661A1] The cylinder head comprises a ceiling (2) which is parallel to a base (1), longitudinal outer walls (3,4) and side walls, a control chamber (12), gas exchange channels (8) and a cooling water chamber. The cooling water chamber is arranged between the cylinder head base and a control chamber (12) abutting on the cylinder head ceiling and containing at least one camshaft. The cooling water chamber is partitioned from the control chamber by a twin-deck. Inflow apertures (15,16) are arranged in the cylinder head base between the base and the twin-deck. The inflowing cooling water circulates from the inflow apertures out of temperature-loaded areas of the gas exchange channels and mixes with a longitudinal and cross flow of the cooling water.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02F 1/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02F 1/40 (2006.01); F02F 1/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02F 1/40 (2013.01); F02F 2001/247 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0816661 A1 19980107; EP 0816661 B1 20021113; PT 816661 E 20030331

INPADOC legal status


2015-05-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140630

2015-05-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140620

2015-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150101

2015-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140620

2015-04-16 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59708692

- Effective date: 20150101

2015-03-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150227

2015-02-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140620

2015-01-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141222

2015-01-02 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20141222

2015-01-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59708692

2013-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20130628

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-11-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130719

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-11-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130701

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-08-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20130619

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130630

- Year of fee payment: 17

2003-11-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030814

2003-06-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-03-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20030204

2003-03-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030226

2002-12-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59708692 20021219

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT PT

2002-11-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-06-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010430

1998-09-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT PT

1998-09-16 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT PT

1998-09-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980707

1998-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT PT