Global Patent Index - EP 0816668 B1

EP 0816668 B1 2002-09-18 - Thin-walled suction tube for an internal combustion engine

Title (en)

Thin-walled suction tube for an internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Dünnwandige Saugrohr für eine Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Tuyau d'admission à paroi mince pour moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 0816668 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97106127 A

Priority

DE 19625768 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: MX9704054A] The present invention discloses: 1. A thin wall suction tube for a combustion engine. 2.1. This type of tubes comprise a low resistance and frequently burst after combustion engine ignition. 2.2. This novel suction tube, on the contrary, is characterized in that an aperture (2) is disposed on the suction tube (1), downstream a butterfly valve reactor, said orifice (2) conducting to the atmosphere and being governed by a valve (3), which responds to pressure on said suction tube (1). 2.3. The novel suction tube can be useful for vehicles combustion engines. 3. Drawing.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 35/10; F16K 15/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 35/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 35/10236 (2013.01); F02M 35/10301 (2013.01); F05C 2225/08 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

EP 0280122 A2 19880831 - BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19625768 A1 19980102; DE 19625768 B4 20090416; BR 9703747 A 19980811; EP 0816668 A2 19980107; EP 0816668 A3 19980422; EP 0816668 B1 20020918; EP 1211409 A1 20020605; ES 2179236 T3 20030116; JP 3893192 B2 20070314; JP H1054314 A 19980224; MX 9704054 A 19971231; US 5826554 A 19981027

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-15 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59708238

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160421

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110416

2012-06-04 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20120604

2012-02-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110415

2012-02-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110415

2012-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110502

2012-01-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20111230

2011-12-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110415

2010-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100427

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-07-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20100423

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-07-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100506

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100324

- Year of fee payment: 14

2003-09-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030619

2003-06-13 [REG FR CJ] CHANGE IN LEGAL FORM

2003-03-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-01-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2179236 T3

2002-12-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021123

2002-10-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59708238 20021024

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2002-09-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2000-03-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000203

1998-04-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1998-01-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970415

1998-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT