Global Patent Index - EP 0816750 B1

EP 0816750 B1 2002-11-06 - Vehicle lighting or signalling device comprising a molded over sealing member

Title (en)

Vehicle lighting or signalling device comprising a molded over sealing member

Title (de)

Fahrzeugbeleuchtungs- oder Signaleinrichtung mit eingespritzter Dichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'éclairage ou de signalisation à joint surmoulé pour véhicule

Publication

EP 0816750 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97401213 A

Priority

FR 9606856 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0816750A1] The headlamp or signal lamp has an elastomer seal (14) moulded over the periphery of the glass (4) at the front of the lamp. The seal presses against the edges (26) of the recess in the vehicle body that accepts the lamp unit, preventing entry of moisture and dust. The profile of the elastomer seal has a thin, flexible lip (24) extending away from the lamp glass, and inclined toward the interior of the recess housing the lamp unit. This lip presses against the edge of the recess, and is deflected inward as the lamp is pushed into place. The seal also fits into a wide shallow groove (16) formed round the periphery of the lamp glass.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21V 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21V 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21S 45/50 (2018.01); F21S 41/29 (2018.01); F21S 43/26 (2018.01); F21S 43/51 (2018.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0816750 A1 19980107; EP 0816750 B1 20021106; DE 69716824 D1 20021212; DE 69716824 T2 20030710; ES 2186853 T3 20030516; FR 2749237 A1 19971205; FR 2749237 B1 19980821

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160708

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2009-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080603

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080602

2009-08-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20080603

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080602

2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090101

2009-02-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080602

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070616

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-11-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070612

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-06-15 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20070615

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-06-12 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070612

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-10-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030807

2003-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2186853 T3

2003-02-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030205

2002-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69716824 20021212

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2002-11-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 21V 17/00 A

2001-06-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010423

1998-09-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

1998-09-16 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1998-08-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980622

1998-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT