Global Patent Index - EP 0816773 A3

EP 0816773 A3 2000-03-22 - Air outlet

Title (en)

Air outlet

Title (de)

Luftauslass

Title (fr)

Sortie d'air

Publication

EP 0816773 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 97110660 A

Priority

DE 19626220 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19626220C1] The outlet delivers hot or cold air into a room via a mouthpiece (2) covered by a perforated plate (1). The mouthpiece has an internal air guide (3) with an ejector (4) guided in a funnel (10). One or more covering rings (11) join onto the funnel and are mounted on the perforated plate. The ejector can consist of a section of pipe movable in the air guide. It can be steplessly adjustable in the guide either manually, hydraulically, electrically or pneumatically. The guide can have a cylindrical collar (9) with opening (9.1) and onto which the widening funnel is joined. An annular gap (8) can be formed between the ring and the mouthpiece.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24F 13/068

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24F 13/06 (2006.01); F24F 13/068 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24F 13/06 (2013.01); F24F 13/068 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19626220 C1 19971009; AT 254745 T 20031215; EP 0816773 A2 19980107; EP 0816773 A3 20000322; EP 0816773 B1 20031119; ES 2208787 T3 20040616

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160628

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160826

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160627

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160620

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160620

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160620

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20160622

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-06-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-09 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59711019

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE UND RECHTSANWALT DR. WEISS, ARA, DE

2015-07-09 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59711019

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE UND RECHTSANWALT WEISS, ARAT & , DE

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040419

2004-11-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040820

2004-07-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2208787 T3

2004-02-19 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040219

2003-12-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59711019 P 20031224

2003-12-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: FREI PATENTANWALTSBUERO

2003-12-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031119

2003-11-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-11-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL PT

2003-11-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-08-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHAKO KLIMA LUFT FERDINAND SCHAD KG

2002-05-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020404

2000-11-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL PT

2000-06-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000406

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL PT