Global Patent Index - EP 0816964 B1

EP 0816964 B1 2000-11-22 - Voltage regulating device with low internal power dissipation

Title (en)

Voltage regulating device with low internal power dissipation

Title (de)

Spannungsregelungsvorrichtung mit geringer interner Verlustleistung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de régulation de tension à faible dissipation interne d'énergie

Publication

EP 0816964 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97201851 A

Priority

FR 9607940 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0816964A1] The voltage regulator circuit delivers a variable current at constant voltage, using series transistors (T1,T2) controlled by an output sensor and a feedback circuit. The energy dissipated over the series transistors is partly taken to the exterior of the regulator by an electric circuit, reducing the power that must be dissipated by the regulator circuit itself. A resistor (R1) is connected between the junction of the two series regulator transistors and the output. By controlling the series transistors part of the current can be diverted round the second transistor through the resistance. A third transistor (T3) is connected as a current mirror to the first (series) transistor (T1) and provides an input to control the extent of current diversion.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G05F 1/569

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G05F 3/26 (2006.01); G05F 1/56 (2006.01); G05F 1/569 (2006.01); G05F 3/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G05F 1/569 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0816964 A1 19980107; EP 0816964 B1 20001122; DE 69703568 D1 20001228; DE 69703568 T2 20010613; FR 2750514 A1 19980102; JP H1063353 A 19980306; US 5929616 A 19990727

INPADOC legal status


2003-04-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030228

2003-02-05 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020617

2003-01-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030101

2002-06-17 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020617

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-08-21 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20010821

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-06-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20010629

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-06-25 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20010625

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-02-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010124

2000-12-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69703568 20001228

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-11-22 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001122

2000-03-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000201

1998-09-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

1998-09-16 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1998-09-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980707

1998-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT