Global Patent Index - EP 0817239 B1

EP 0817239 B1 2003-06-11 - Ion trapping mass spectrometry apparatus

Title (en)

Ion trapping mass spectrometry apparatus

Title (de)

Ionenspeicherungsvorrichtung für Massenspektrometrie

Title (fr)

Dispositif de stockage d'ions à des fins de spectrométrie de masse

Publication

EP 0817239 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97111068 A

Priority

JP 17202396 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0817239A1] A mass spectrometry apparatus having a constitution for attaining analysis with high sensitivity and high resolving power comprising a linear radio-frequency quadrupole ion trap and means for avoiding degradation of analysis performance due to field disturbance caused by an end electrode (13, 14) thereof, where said purpose is achieved by means for forming a harmonic potential in the central axis thereof in whose potential ions are resonantly oscillated to be ejected outside of the ion trap for detection along the axis, or by means to eliminate undesirably degraded signals originating near the ion trap portions that are disturbed by the end electrodes (13, 14). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 49/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01J 49/26 (2006.01); H01J 49/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 49/4225 (2013.01); H01J 49/423 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0817239 A1 19980107; EP 0817239 B1 20030611; DE 69722717 D1 20030717; DE 69722717 T2 20040429; JP 3495512 B2 20040209; JP H1021871 A 19980123

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20170701

2017-07-26 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20170701

2017-07-02 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69722717

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160628

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160629

- Year of fee payment: 20

2008-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070731

2008-06-13 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080331

2006-07-15 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060715

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-06-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040312

2004-04-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-07-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69722717 P 20030717

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-06-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

1999-11-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991008

1998-09-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

1998-09-16 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1998-01-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971030

1998-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB