Global patent index - EP 0817289 A3

EP 0817289 A3 2000-05-03 - Sealed storage battery with safety valve and method of producing same

Title (en)

Sealed storage battery with safety valve and method of producing same

Title (de)

Verschlossener Akkumulator mit Sicherheitsventil und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung

Title (fr)

Accumulateur étanche avec soupape de sûreté et procédé pour sa fabrication

Publication

EP 0817289 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 96119718 A

Priority

JP 17200796 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0817289A2] A sealed storage battery includes a battery case containing a group of electric power-generating elements each comprising a positive electrode, a negative electrode and a separator, a battery case lid closing an opening in the battery case to seal the battery case, and a safety valve of the assembling type mounted on the battery case lid. The safety valve is welded to the battery case lid. With this construction, a hermetic seal at an area of contact between the safety valve and the battery case lid is enhanced, and also the reliability of the safety valve is enhanced.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01M 2/12; H01M 2/02; H01M 2/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01M 2/04 (2006.01); H01M 2/02 (2006.01); H01M 2/12 (2006.01); H01M 2/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01M 2/0262 (2013.01); H01M 2/028 (2013.01); H01M 2/043 (2013.01); H01M 2/12 (2013.01); H01M 2/1223 (2013.01); H01M 2/1276 (2013.01); H01M 2/36 (2013.01); H01M 2/362 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [XA] EP 0692829 A1 19960117 - MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]
  • [A] US 5356733 A 19941018 - GREEN GREG [US], et al
  • [XA] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 010, no. 340 (E - 455) 18 November 1986 (1986-11-18)
  • [XA] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 012, no. 168 (E - 611) 20 May 1988 (1988-05-20)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 010, no. 108 (E - 398) 23 April 1986 (1986-04-23)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 012, no. 328 (E - 654) 6 September 1988 (1988-09-06)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 014, no. 489 (E - 0994) 24 October 1990 (1990-10-24)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0817289 A2 19980107; EP 0817289 A3 20000503; EP 0817289 B1 20030305; CN 1082260 C 20020403; CN 1169596 A 19980107; DE 69626504 D1 20030410; DE 69626504 T2 20031211; EP 1241717 A2 20020918; EP 1241717 A3 20060621; EP 1241717 B1 20110713; EP 1241717 B8 20120208; JP 3351243 B2 20021125; JP H1021893 A 19980123; US 6235419 B1 20010522; US 6255013 B1 20010703

INPADOC legal status

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151110

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151209

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151201

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-11-10 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 20

2004-02-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20031208

2003-10-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-04-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69626504

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-04-10

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-03-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-03-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2001-05-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010322

2001-01-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-04-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7H 01M 2/12 A, 7H 01M 2/36 B, 7H 01M 2/02 B

1998-01-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19961209

1998-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB