Global Patent Index - EP 0817301 B1

EP 0817301 B1 2002-09-11 - Input coupling adjustment arrangement for radio frequency filters

Title (en)

Input coupling adjustment arrangement for radio frequency filters

Title (de)

Justiervorrichtung für die Kopplungseinstellung von Funkfrequenzfilter

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'ajustement de couplage d'entrée de filtres à fréquence radio

Publication

EP 0817301 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97110682 A

Priority

AU PO076496 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0817301A1] An arrangement for adjustably coupling a radio frequency input port to a resonator element of the filter. The arrangement comprises a resilient conductor (19) which extends from the input port (15) into the electric field of a resonator element (2). The remote end of the resilient conductor resiliently abuts the point (20) of an adjustment screw (20a). Operating the screw moves the resilient conductor in relation to the electric field and alters the capacitive coupling between the input port and the resonator element for fine tuning the impedance match of the input to the filter. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01P 1/205; H01P 5/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01P 1/205 (2006.01); H01P 5/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01P 1/2053 (2013.01); H01P 5/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK FI FR IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0817301 A1 19980107; EP 0817301 B1 20020911; AU PO076496 A0 19960725; CA 2209419 A1 19980101; CA 2209419 C 20000815; DE 69715329 D1 20021017; DE 69715329 T2 20030522

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160701

2017-04-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160801

2017-04-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170201

2017-04-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170331

2017-02-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69715329

2015-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150727

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150721

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150626

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-06-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-11-28 [REG FR RG] LIEN (PLEDGE) CANCELLED

- Effective date: 20141016

2014-08-22 [REG FR GC] LIEN (PLEDGE) CONSTITUTED

- Effective date: 20140717

2003-09-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030612

2003-04-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-12-11 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021211

2002-12-11 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021211

2002-10-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69715329 20021017

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE DK FI FR IT SE

2002-09-11 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020911

2001-01-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001212

1999-03-31 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT

- Owner name: ALCATEL

1999-02-24 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT

- Owner name: ALCATEL

1998-09-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE DK FI FR IT SE

1998-09-16 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE DK FI FR IT SE

1998-04-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980204

1998-01-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: PELZ DIETER,

1998-01-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: TREMBATH, NATALIE

1998-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE DK FI FR IT SE