Global Patent Index - EP 0817308 B1

EP 0817308 B1 2002-11-27 - Method for the automatic selection of one beam among those formed by a multibeam antenna, in particular for radiomobile systems

Title (en)

Method for the automatic selection of one beam among those formed by a multibeam antenna, in particular for radiomobile systems

Title (de)

Verfahren für die automatische Auswahl eines Strahles aus solchen die von einer Mehrstrahlantenne gebildet werden, insbesondere für Mobilfunksysteme

Title (fr)

Méthode pour la sélection automatique d'un faisceau parmi ceux d'une antenne multifaisceau, en particulier pour systèmes radio mobiles

Publication

EP 0817308 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97111319 A

Priority

IT MI961369 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0817308A2] The invention relates to a method for the automatic selection of a beam among those set up by a multibeam antenna, in particular for radiomobile systems comprising an equipment for the reception of radio frequency signals provided with an array (10) of radiant and/or receiving elements, a beam former (5) connected downstream of the array and a device for the selection (9) of the best beam linked to the beam former (5). The selection of the best beam is carried out by the selection device (9) choosing the beam presenting the minimum value of an estimation of the decoding error probability of the received signals (Fig. 1). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01Q 3/26; G01S 1/00; H01Q 25/00; H04Q 7/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01Q 3/24 (2006.01); H01Q 3/26 (2006.01); H01Q 25/00 (2006.01); H04Q 7/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 3/24 (2013.01); H01Q 3/26 (2013.01); H01Q 25/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0817308 A2 19980107; EP 0817308 A3 19980408; EP 0817308 B1 20021127; DE 69717354 D1 20030109; DE 69717354 T2 20030918; IT 1285217 B1 19980603; IT MI961369 A1 19980105; IT MI961369 D0 19960704

INPADOC legal status


2010-07-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080705

2009-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080731

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080704

2009-05-29 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080704

2009-05-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090331

2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090203

2009-03-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080704

2009-03-17 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070710

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-01-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20070712

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-01-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070720

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-11-24 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20070713

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070731

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-11-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030828

2003-06-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-01-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69717354 20030109

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB SE

2002-11-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-10-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEMENS MOBILE COMMUNICATIONS S.P.A.

2002-01-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011214

1999-03-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981012

1999-03-03 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT

- Owner name: ITALTEL S.P.A.

1998-12-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FI FR GB SE

1998-12-23 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB SE

1998-04-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB SE