Global Patent Index - EP 0817331 B1

EP 0817331 B1 2001-03-21 - Terminal belt guiding mechanism for use with a terminal crimping unit

Title (en)

Terminal belt guiding mechanism for use with a terminal crimping unit

Title (de)

Crimpvorrichtung mit Kontaktführungsverfahren

Title (fr)

Dispositif de sertissage de contacts avec mécanisme de guidage

Publication

EP 0817331 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97304826 A

Priority

JP 17461596 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0817331A2] To provide flexibility for a guided terminal belt (B), a roller member (45) is used to feed a terminal carrier (T4). The roller member (45) has a contact area (45B) to make rolling contact with the carrier (T4). The contact area presses the carrier against an abutment face (42) as the carrier advances in a feeding direction. Feeding is performed when a terminal fitting (T) of the terminal belt is in a released or disengaged state. This makes feeding possible regardless of the type of terminal fitting to be crimped, thus, providing flexibility for the terminal belt to be guided. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 43/055

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 51/02 (2006.01); B65H 23/025 (2006.01); H01R 43/055 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 43/055 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0817331 A2 19980107; EP 0817331 A3 19980513; EP 0817331 B1 20010321; CN 1059765 C 20001220; CN 1170260 A 19980114; DE 69704305 D1 20010426; DE 69704305 T2 20010823; JP H1022041 A 19980123; US 5967395 A 19991019

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070702

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060731

2007-05-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070330

2007-03-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060702

2007-02-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070201

2006-07-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060731

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-07-02 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060702

2005-07-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050708

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050630

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-06-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050629

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-03-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-05 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: SOCIETA' ITALIANA BREVETTI S.P.A.

2001-05-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-04-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69704305 20010426

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-01-17 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-04-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990312

1999-01-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT PT

1999-01-27 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT PT

1998-05-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-05-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI

1998-01-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970717

1998-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1998-01-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI