Global Patent Index - EP 0817585 B1

EP 0817585 B1 2001-12-19 - SEAT CUSHION

Title (en)

SEAT CUSHION

Title (de)

SITZKISSEN

Title (fr)

COUSSIN DE SIEGE

Publication

EP 0817585 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96904874 A

Priority

  • FI 9600143 W
  • FI 951421 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9629918A1] The invention relates to a seat cushion comprising a number of elongate bag-like elements that can be filled with gas. According to the invention, the bag-like elements are arranged into element groups (12, 13, 14), so that the first element group (12) includes three elements, the first and second (12b, 12c) of which are arranged lengthwise at the sides (S) of the seat cushion, and the third (12a) is arranged transversally in the rear (T) of the seat cushion; the second element group (13) includes at least one element (13a, 13b), provided in the middle area of the seat cushion; and the third element group (14) includes at least one element (14), arranged transversally at the front (E) of the seat cushion, and the gas pressure of the elements in said element groups is adjustable from outside the seat cushion, so that the first element group supports, on an area as large as possible, the patient's buttocks from the sides and the region below the lumbar spine from the back, the second element group supports the tailbone region and essentially the back of the thighs, and the third element group is used for adjusting the seating angle of the patient.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 27/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 27/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61G 5/1043 (2013.01); A61G 5/1045 (2016.11); A61G 7/05776 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9629918 A1 19961003; AU 4881296 A 19961016; DE 69618182 D1 20020131; DE 69618182 T2 20020814; EP 0817585 A1 19980114; EP 0817585 B1 20011219; FI 108111 B 20011130; FI 951421 A0 19950324; FI 951421 A 19960925; JP H11502447 A 19990302

INPADOC legal status


2005-01-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-10-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

2004-10-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041001

2004-03-08 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040308

2003-03-26 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030326

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-02-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030228

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-02-21 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030221

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-12-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-06-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-03-19 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020319

2002-03-19 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020319

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69618182 20020131

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR GB IT SE

2001-12-19 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011219

2001-05-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010406

1998-01-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971022

1998-01-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR GB IT SE