Global Patent Index - EP 0817748 B1

EP 0817748 B1 2000-02-16 - CARRIER FEEDER MECHANISM AND APPARATUS FOR LOADING CONTAINERS INTO OPEN-BOTTOMED CARRIER

Title (en)

CARRIER FEEDER MECHANISM AND APPARATUS FOR LOADING CONTAINERS INTO OPEN-BOTTOMED CARRIER

Title (de)

TRÄGERZUFÜHRUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM LADEN VON BEHÄLTERN IN TRÄGER MIT OFFENEM BODEN

Title (fr)

MECANISME D'ALIMENTATION DE STRUCTURES PORTEUSES ET DISPOSITIF DE CHARGEMENT DE RECIPIENTS DANS UNE STRUCTURE PORTEUSE OUVERTE SUR LE FOND

Publication

EP 0817748 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96911779 A

Priority

  • US 9605233 W
  • US 42111395 A
  • US 45032395 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9632322A1] An apparatus (10) for loading containers into basket-style bottom-loading carriers (3) has a container infeed mechanism; a carrier infeed supplier (30); a carrier feeder mechanism (50) for removing carriers from the carrier infeed supplier; a carrier timer-transport assembly (60 or 260) for receiving carriers (3) from the carrier infeed supplier and initiating transport of the carriers in synchronous parallel motion above the containers; a gripper (82) assembly for opening the carriers (3); a declination belt assembly (90) forming a pathway for receiving transversely extending bottom panels of said carriers and transporting said carriers downwardly over the groupings of containers; a seating assembling (120) for engaging tops of handles of carriers such that as the seating members rotate the bottommost seating member engages the respective tops of the handles of the carriers; and bottom-panel closure mechanisms (130, 140, 182) for placing the bottom panels together in locking relationship with respect to one another.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 43/18; B65B 21/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 21/06 (2006.01); B65B 17/02 (2006.01); B65B 21/02 (2006.01); B65B 21/14 (2006.01); B65B 21/22 (2006.01); B65B 21/24 (2006.01); B65B 35/30 (2006.01); B65B 43/18 (2006.01); B65B 43/26 (2006.01); B65B 43/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 21/242 (2013.01); B65B 43/185 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9632322 A1 19961017; AR 001625 A1 19971126; AR 001626 A1 19971126; AR 001627 A1 19971126; AT 189655 T 20000215; AT 189793 T 20000315; AT 189794 T 20000315; AT 220628 T 20020815; AT 221016 T 20020815; AT 221488 T 20020815; AU 5485796 A 19961030; AU 5545096 A 19961030; AU 5546196 A 19961030; AU 5546296 A 19961030; AU 5548196 A 19961030; AU 5664496 A 19961030; AU 706228 B2 19990610; BR 9604939 A 19980609; BR 9604962 A 19980714; BR 9604963 A 19980714; BR 9604964 A 19980714; BR 9605000 A 19990202; CA 2218035 A1 19961017; CA 2218035 C 20070626; CA 2218041 A1 19961017; CA 2218041 C 20051122; CA 2218046 A1 19961017; CA 2218046 C 20060124; CA 2218065 A1 19961017; CA 2218065 C 20051129; CA 2218071 A1 19961017; CA 2218071 C 20010731; CN 1073526 C 20011024; CN 1073527 C 20011024; CN 1082005 C 20020403; CN 1186469 A 19980701; CN 1186470 A 19980701; CN 1186471 A 19980701; CZ 294073 B6 20040915; CZ 9703222 A3 19980513; DE 69606629 D1 20000316; DE 69606629 T2 20000621; DE 69606702 D1 20000323; DE 69606702 T2 20000621; DE 69606704 D1 20000323; DE 69606704 T2 20000621; DE 69622388 D1 20020822; DE 69622388 T2 20030220; DE 69622549 D1 20020829; DE 69622549 T2 20030306; DE 69622699 D1 20020905; DE 69622699 T2 20030612; DK 0817745 T3 20021118; DK 0817746 T3 20000515; DK 0817747 T3 20000605; DK 0817748 T3 20000605; DK 0820403 T3 20020902; DK 0820404 T3 20021028; EP 0817745 A1 19980114; EP 0817745 A4 19990707; EP 0817745 B1 20020731; EP 0817746 A1 19980114; EP 0817746 B1 20000209; EP 0817747 A1 19980114; EP 0817747 B1 20000216; EP 0817748 A2 19980114; EP 0817748 B1 20000216; EP 0820403 A1 19980128; EP 0820403 A4 19990630; EP 0820403 B1 20020717; EP 0820404 A1 19980128; EP 0820404 A4 19990707; EP 0820404 B1 20020724; ES 2143192 T3 20000501; ES 2143195 T3 20000501; ES 2143196 T3 20000501; ES 2180762 T3 20030216; ES 2180763 T3 20030216; ES 2180766 T3 20030216; GR 3032869 T3 20000731; GR 3033202 T3 20000831; GR 3033378 T3 20000929; HK 1008200 A1 20030214; HU 9900893 A2 19990728; HU 9900893 A3 20000128; IL 117897 A 20000217; IL 117897 D0 19960804; IL 117898 D0 19960804; IL 117899 A 20000217; IL 117899 D0 19960804; JP 3830516 B2 20061004; JP 3830517 B2 20061004; JP 3917180 B2 20070523; JP 3923522 B2 20070606; JP 3923523 B2 20070606; JP H11503693 A 19990330; JP H11503694 A 19990330; JP H11503695 A 19990330; JP H11503696 A 19990330; JP H11503697 A 19990330; KR 100454351 B1 20041217; KR 100454352 B1 20041217; KR 100454353 B1 20041217; KR 100454354 B1 20041217; MX 9707467 A 19971129; MX 9707468 A 19971129; MX 9707469 A 19971129; MX 9707470 A 19971129; MX 9707471 A 19971129; MY 123046 A 20060531; NZ 306815 A 19990128; PL 179609 B1 20001031; PL 322762 A1 19980216; PT 817745 E 20021031; PT 817746 E 20000531; PT 817747 E 20000630; PT 817748 E 20000630; PT 820403 E 20021129; PT 820404 E 20021129; TR 9701089 T1 19980321; TW 307730 B 19970611; TW 315353 B 19970911; TW 325450 B 19980121; WO 9632320 A1 19961017; WO 9632321 A1 19961017; WO 9632324 A1 19961017; WO 9632325 A1 19961017; WO 9632327 A2 19961017; WO 9632327 A3 19970227

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080415

2009-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080416

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080415

2009-06-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20080416

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080430

2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081101

2009-01-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081101

2009-01-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20081231

2009-01-05 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20081101

2008-12-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080415

2008-10-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061102

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070417

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070522

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-12-31 [BECA] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S ADDRESS

- Owner name: *MEADWESTVACO PACKAGING SYSTEMS LLCONE HIGH RIDGE

- Effective date: 20060703

2007-12-31 [BECH] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER

- Owner name: *MEADWESTVACO PACKAGING SYSTEMS LLC

- Effective date: 20060703

2007-12-31 [BECN] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S NAME

- Owner name: *MEADWESTVACO PACKAGING SYSTEMS LLC

- Effective date: 20060703

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *MEADWESTVACO PACKAGING SYSTEMS LLC

- Effective date: 20060430

2007-11-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070425

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070531

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-04-26 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20070426

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-04-24 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20070424

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-01-10 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2006-12-29 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20061016

2006-12-19 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2006-12-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-12-04 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2006-10-16 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061016

2006-05-01 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060501

2006-04-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060430

2006-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060430

2006-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060430

2006-04-17 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060417

2006-04-16 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060416

2006-04-15 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060415

2006-04-15 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060415

2005-05-04 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20050504

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-04-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: MW CUSTOM PAPERS, INC (A DELAWARE CORPORATION)

2005-04-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: MEADWESTVACO PACKAGING SYSTEMS LLC

2005-04-01 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: MW CUSTOM PAPERS, LLC

2005-03-29 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20050329

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-03-23 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20050323

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-03-21 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20050321

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-03-17 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20050317

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-03-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: MEADWESTVACO PACKAGING SYSTEMS, LLC

- Free text: THE MEAD CORPORATION#COURTHOUSE PLAZA NE#DAYTON OHIO 45463 (US) -TRANSFER TO- MEADWESTVACO PACKAGING SYSTEMS, LLC#ONE HIGH RIDGE PARK#STAMFORD, CT 06905 (US)

2005-03-14 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20050314

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-03-11 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20050311

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-03-11 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20050311

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-03-08 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20050308

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-01-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-06-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20000314

2000-06-05 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2000-05-03 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2000-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2143192 T3

2000-04-27 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: SOCIETA' ITALIANA BREVETTI S.P.A.

2000-03-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69606704 20000323

2000-03-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-02-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-02-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KIRKER & CIE SA

2000-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

2000-02-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 189794 T 20000315

1998-03-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980129

1998-01-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971113

1998-01-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE