Global Patent Index - EP 0817763 A4

EP 0817763 A4 2000-05-31 - BIOMASS REDUCTION AND BIOREMEDIATION PROCESSES AND PRODUCTS

Title (en)

BIOMASS REDUCTION AND BIOREMEDIATION PROCESSES AND PRODUCTS

Title (de)

VERMINDERUNG DER BIOMASSE UND VERFAHREN DER BIOLOGISCHEN ENTSORGUNG UND PRODUKTE

Title (fr)

PROCEDES DE REDUCTION DE LA BIOMASSE ET DE BIORESTAURATION ET PRODUITS

Publication

EP 0817763 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 96911348 A

Priority

  • US 9603775 W
  • US 40271195 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9628400A1] An aerobic, thermophilic, alkalinic composting process for biodegrading waste products and producing byproducts which are useful for agriculture fertilizer as well as for bioremediating organic and hydrocarbon products. The composting process has multiple steps including an early step of creating extremely high temperature and extremely high pH to stress bacteria to enable them to induce enzymatically catalyzed hydrolysis of waste products or organics or hydrocarbons in the presence of water. This is accomplished at the end of a first composting stage, employing indiginous bacteria under ambient conditions, by adding alkaline materials to the compost pile to reach a pH of at least 10, followed by a second composting stage, and then adding nutrients to the compost pile while maintaining a high level of moisture in the compost pile during the final composting stage. Composted products are unique and are suitable for use in subsequent processes for bioremediating organic and hydrocarbon contaminant materials in situ or ex situ. In situ subsurface bioremediation of soils is benefited by combining DC electrical currents to help propagate treating materials through contaminated soils or clay.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C05F 1/00; B09C 1/10; C05F 3/00; C05F 9/00; C05F 11/00; C05F 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B09C 1/10 (2006.01); C05F 9/04 (2006.01); C05F 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B09C 1/10 (2013.01); C05F 9/04 (2013.01); C05F 17/0027 (2013.01); C05F 17/0045 (2013.01); B09C 2101/00 (2013.01); Y02P 20/145 (2015.11); Y02W 30/43 (2015.05)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] DATABASE WPI Section Ch Week 199511, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class C04, AN 1995-077920, XP002134319 & EP 0745573 A1 19961204 - KIMURA MITSUYO [JP]
  • [X] DATABASE BIOSIS BIOSCIENCES INFORMATION SERVICE, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US; PARK S.J. ET AL: "studies on the alkalphilic bacteria producing alkaline protease and its enzyme activities", XP002134374 & JOURNAL OF THE PHARMACEUTICAL SOCIETY OF KOREA, vol. 34, - 1990, pages 47 - 53JOURNAL OF THE PHARMACEUTICAL SOCIETY OF KOREA1990344753
  • [X] DATABASE BIOSIS BIOSCIENCES INFORMATION SERVICE, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US; DHANDAPANI ET AL.: "production of a thermophilic, extracellular alkaline protease by bacillus stearothermophilus ap-4", XP002134375 & WORLD JOURNAL OF MICROBIOLOGY & BIOTECHNOLOGY, vol. 10, - 1994, pages 33 - 35WORLD JOURNAL OF MICROBIOLOGY & BIOTECHNOLOGY1994103335
  • [X] DATABASE BIOSIS BIOSCIENCES INFORMATION SERVICE, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US; 1994, MASUI AKIHIKO: "Stabilization and rational design of serine protease AprM under highly alkaline and high-temperature conditions.", XP002134317 & APPLIED AND ENVIRONMENTAL MICROBIOLOGY, vol. 60, no. 10, pages 3579-3584APPLIED AND ENVIRONMENTAL MICROBIOLOGY60103579-3584
  • [X] DATABASE BIOSIS BIOSCIENCES INFORMATION SERVICE, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US; 1994, WILSON S -A; PEEK K; DANIEL R M: "Immobilization of a proteinase from the extremely thermophilic organism Thermus Rt41A.", XP002134318 & BIOTECHNOLOGY AND BIOENGINEERING, vol. 43, no. 3, pages 225 - 231BIOTECHNOLOGY AND BIOENGINEERING433225231
  • See also references of WO 9628400A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9628400 A1 19960919; EA 000660 B1 19991229; EA 199700229 A1 19980226; EP 0817763 A1 19980114; EP 0817763 A4 20000531

INPADOC legal status


2003-05-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021001

2001-08-08 [RA4] DATE AND KIND OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20010620

2000-05-31 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000412

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 05F 1/00 A, 7C 05F 3/00 B, 7C 05F 9/00 B, 7C 05F 11/00 B, 7C 05F 17/00 B, 7B 09C 1/10 B

1998-01-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971011

1998-01-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-01-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 971016;LV PAYMENT 971016