Global Patent Index - EP 0817827 B1

EP 0817827 B1 2000-03-01 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCING AQUEOUS SURFACTANT CONCENTRATES

Title (en)

PROCESS FOR PRODUCING AQUEOUS SURFACTANT CONCENTRATES

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG WÄSSRIGER TENSIDKONZENTRATE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE CONCENTRES TENSIOACTIFS AQUEUX

Publication

EP 0817827 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96909103 A

Priority

  • DE 19511670 A
  • EP 9601216 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19511670A1] The invention concerns aqueous surfactant concentrates having a solids content of between 35 and 65 wt % and containing: (a1) alkyl oligoglycosides and/or alkenyloligoglycosides; and/or (a2) fatty acid N-alkylpolyhydroxyalkylamides; and (b) betaine, in weight ratios of (a):(b) of between 10:90 and 90:10. The pH of these concentrates is in the range of between 3.5 and 6.5. The concentrates are low-viscosity, are free of cloudiness and are stable during storage.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 1/94

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 1/94 (2006.01); C11D 1/52 (2006.01); C11D 1/66 (2006.01); C11D 1/88 (2006.01); C11D 1/90 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 1/94 (2013.01); C11D 1/525 (2013.01); C11D 1/662 (2013.01); C11D 1/88 (2013.01); C11D 1/90 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

EP 0728836 A2 19960828 - GOLDSCHMIDT AG TH [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19511670 A1 19961002; EP 0817827 A1 19980114; EP 0817827 B1 20000301; ES 2144734 T3 20000616; US 5958868 A 19990928; WO 9630477 A1 19961003

INPADOC legal status


2008-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070322

2008-06-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20070322

2008-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071002

2006-04-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060428

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-04-20 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060420

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-03-21 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050321

2004-03-16 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC2A

2004-01-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2003-11-27 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031127

2002-03-12 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020312

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-02-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2144734

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-05-16 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-05-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-04-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59604543

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-04-06

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

1999-11-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: COGNIS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1998-04-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980316

1998-01-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970922

1998-01-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT