Global Patent Index - EP 0817829 B1

EP 0817829 B1 2000-05-24 - LIQUID SCOURING COMPOSITION

Title (en)

LIQUID SCOURING COMPOSITION

Title (de)

FLÜSSIGES SCHEUERMITTEL

Title (fr)

COMPOSITION A RECURER SE PRESENTANT SOUS FORME LIQUIDE

Publication

EP 0817829 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96908165 A

Priority

  • FR 9600425 W
  • FR 9503662 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9630480A1] Liquid scouring composition, including one or more surfactants, a scouring calcite and/or dolomite filler and water, characterised in that the scouring filler comprises a mixture of calcite and/or dolomite and talc. Such a filler allows the proportion of filler in the composition to be reduced while maintaining, and even enhancing, its performance.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 3/14; C11D 3/12; C11D 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/12 (2006.01); C11D 3/14 (2006.01); C11D 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 17/0013 (2013.01); C11D 3/1233 (2013.01); C11D 3/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9630480 A1 19961003; AT 193316 T 20000615; AU 5150196 A 19961016; CZ 288007 B6 20010314; CZ 9703048 A3 19980114; DE 69608552 D1 20000629; DE 69608552 T2 20010215; EP 0817829 A1 19980114; EP 0817829 B1 20000524; ES 2148741 T3 20001016; FR 2732354 A1 19961004; FR 2732354 B1 19970530; HU 9801203 A2 19980828; HU 9801203 A3 20001128; PL 180357 B1 20010131; PL 322469 A1 19980202

INPADOC legal status


2005-03-21 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050321

2004-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20020411

2002-01-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020101

2001-12-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2001-12-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20011001

2001-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011130

2001-11-14 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20010321

2001-10-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011001

2001-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: TALC DE LUZENAC

- Effective date: 20010331

2001-05-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010331

2001-03-22 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010322

2001-03-21 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010321

2000-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2148741 T3

2000-09-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000811

2000-08-02 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DOTT. ING. FRANCO RASTELLI

2000-06-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69608552 20000629

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

2000-05-24 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000524

2000-05-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 193316 T 20000615

1999-09-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990728

1998-01-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970829

1998-01-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL