Global patent index - EP 0817886 B1

EP 0817886 B1 2000-01-19 - WEB OF FABRIC AND PROCESS FOR ITS PRODUCTION

Title (en)

WEB OF FABRIC AND PROCESS FOR ITS PRODUCTION

Title (de)

MATERIALBAHN SOWIE VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG

Title (fr)

BANDE DE MATERIAU ET SA FABRICATION

Publication

EP 0817886 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97901065 A

Priority

  • EP 97901065 A
  • EP 9700215 W
  • EP 96101069 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0786550A1] A web of fabric (1) with a carrier (2) has an externally-even plastic layer (5, 6) at least on one side, traversed by transfer channels. According to the invention, the external side (7, 8) of the plastic layer (5, 6) also has impressions (9) between the openings of the transfer channels which are at least partly connected with one another and with the transfer channels. During the production of the fabric web, soluble particles are applied to the external side (7, 8) of the plastic layer (5, 6) during or after the production of the plastic layer (5, 6) and then pressed into the plastic layer (5, 6). These soluble particles may then be extracted by a solvent to which the fabric web (1) is resistant.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 7/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 1/00 (2006.01); D21F 7/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 1/0063 (2013.01); D21F 7/083 (2013.01); Y10T 442/3016 (2015.04); Y10T 442/3024 (2015.04); Y10T 442/3854 (2015.04); Y10T 442/3862 (2015.04); Y10T 442/3886 (2015.04); Y10T 442/3894 (2015.04); Y10T 442/3911 (2015.04); Y10T 442/40 (2015.04); Y10T 442/602 (2015.04); Y10T 442/674 (2015.04); Y10T 442/675 (2015.04); Y10T 442/678 (2015.04); Y10T 442/679 (2015.04); Y10T 442/681 (2015.04)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

FI GR IE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0786550 A1 19970730; EP 0786550 B1 20000119; AT 189016 T 20000215; AU 1444597 A 19970820; AU 696610 B2 19980917; BR 9704636 A 19980609; CA 2213841 A1 19970731; CA 2213841 C 20021001; CZ 293405 B6 20040414; CZ 9702996 A3 19971217; DE 59604227 D1 20000224; DK 0786550 T3 20000626; EP 0817886 A1 19980114; EP 0817886 B1 20000119; ES 2144162 T3 20000601; GR 3032802 T3 20000630; MX 9707245 A 19980830; MY 119214 A 20050430; NO 311229 B1 20011029; NO 974421 A 19970924; NO 974421 D0 19970924; PL 182272 B1 20011231; PL 322383 A1 19980119; PT 786550 E 20000531; SI 817886 T1 20000630; SK 130097 A3 19980603; SK 279612 B6 19990111; TR 9701032 T1 19971221; US 6057255 A 20000502; WO 9727362 A1 19970731; ZA 9700598 B 19970808

INPADOC legal status

2015-10-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150117

2014-04-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140122

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-01-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100118

2010-10-27 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

2010-09-30 [REG SI KO00] LAPSE OF PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: KO00

- Effective date: 20100826

2009-06-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090123

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-04-30 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090122

- Year of fee payment: 13

2005-01-10 [REG SI IF] VALID ON THE PRS DATE

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF

2001-01-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-03-08 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): FI GR IE

2000-01-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: LT PAYMENT 19970812;SI PAYMENT 19970812

1999-07-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990607

1998-05-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980326

1998-01-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): FI GR IE

1998-01-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: LT PAYMENT 970812;SI PAYMENT 970812