Global Patent Index - EP 0817915 B1

EP 0817915 B1 2001-12-19 - FUEL-INJECTION VALVE FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINES

Title (en)

FUEL-INJECTION VALVE FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINES

Title (de)

KRAFTSTOFFEINSPRITZVENTIL FÜR BRENNKRAFTMASCHINEN

Title (fr)

SOUPAPE D'INJECTION DE CARBURANT POUR MOTEURS A COMBUSTION INTERNE

Publication

EP 0817915 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96942256 A

Priority

  • DE 9601875 W
  • DE 19602615 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19602615A1] The invention concerns a fuel-injection valve for internal combustion engines, the valve comprising a valve member (9) which can be axially displaced in a bore (7) of a valve body (1) by fuel pressure against the restoring force of a valve spring. The valve member (9) has a piston-like valve head (11) in which is provided at least one injection duct (47) leading from a pressure chamber (23) delimited in the bore (7). In the closed position of the valve member (9), the injection duct outlet cross-section (49) at the peripheral surface of the valve head (11) is completely covered by the valve body (1) and, during the outwardly directed opening stroke, is opened by a lower control edge (51) at the combustion chamber end of the valve body (1). In order to produce a short, well atomized injection jet, the outlet cross-section (49) is opened only partially, to a maximum 50 % by the lower control edge (51) of the valve body (1).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 61/08; F02M 61/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 61/04 (2006.01); F02M 61/08 (2006.01); F02M 61/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 61/08 (2013.01); F02M 61/045 (2013.01); F02M 61/1806 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19602615 A1 19970731; EP 0817915 A1 19980114; EP 0817915 B1 20011219; JP H11502587 A 19990302; WO 9727397 A1 19970731

INPADOC legal status


2005-09-26 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050926

2004-05-19 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030926

2004-04-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040401

2003-09-26 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030926

2002-12-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-10-25 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20021025

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-08-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020828

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-04-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020314

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59608504 20020131

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2000-01-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991123

1998-04-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980202

1998-01-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT