Global patent index - EP 0817967 A4

EP 0817967 A4 2000-05-17 - INSULIN MIMETIC AND ENHANCER ASSAY

Title (en)

INSULIN MIMETIC AND ENHANCER ASSAY

Title (de)

TEST FÜR INSULIN NACHAHMENDE UND VERSTÄRKENDE SUBSTANZEN

Title (fr)

METHODE D'IDENTIFICATION DE COMPOSES IMITANT ET AMPLIFIANT L'ACTION DE L'INSULINE

Publication

EP 0817967 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 96910609 A

Priority

  • US 9604226 W
  • US 41497695 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9630762A1] Compounds that are insulin mimetic and enhancer agents and methods of identifying compounds that mimic and enhance insulin action are provided.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01N 33/567; A61K 38/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/567 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 38/28 (2006.01); A61K 45/00 (2006.01); A61P 3/04 (2006.01); A61P 3/08 (2006.01); A61P 9/00 (2006.01); A61P 9/12 (2006.01); A61P 25/28 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12Q 1/02 (2006.01); C12Q 1/48 (2006.01); G01N 33/15 (2006.01); G01N 33/74 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/74 (2013.01); A61K 38/28 (2013.01); C12Q 1/485 (2013.01); G01N 2333/62 (2013.01); G01N 2333/72 (2013.01); G01N 2333/9121 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [PX] WO 9523217 A2 19950831 - MAX PLANCK GESELLSCHAFT [DE], et al
  • [PX] WO 9519570 A1 19950720 - GENENTECH INC [US], et al
  • [PX] WO 9523231 A1 19950831 - MAX PLANCK GESELLSCHAFT [DE]
  • [E] WO 9614075 A1 19960517 - UNIV VIRGINIA [US]
  • [X] ZHANG B. ET AL: "Potentiation of insulin stimulation of phosphatidylinositol 3-kinase by thiazolidinedione-derived antidiabetic agents in Chinese hamster ovary cells expressing human insulin receptors and L6 myotubes.", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (1994) 269/41 (25735-25741)., XP000872885
  • [DX] ZHANG B., ROTH R. A.: "The insulin receptor-related Receptor", THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, vol. 267, no. 26, 25 September 1992 (1992-09-25), pages 18320 - 18328, XP000872876
  • See also references of WO 9630762A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9630762 A1 19961003; CA 2216806 A1 19961003; EP 0817967 A1 19980114; EP 0817967 A4 20000517; JP H11503519 A 19990326

INPADOC legal status

2001-08-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010213

2000-09-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000801

2000-05-17 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20000330

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

1998-01-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19971031

1998-01-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE