Global Patent Index - EP 0818121 B1

EP 0818121 B1 2002-09-04 - SOUND PICK-UP AND REPRODUCTION SYSTEM FOR A HEADSET IN A NOISY ENVIRONMENT

Title (en)

SOUND PICK-UP AND REPRODUCTION SYSTEM FOR A HEADSET IN A NOISY ENVIRONMENT

Title (de)

SYSTEM ZUR TON- UND HÖRAUFNAHME FÜR HELM IN GERÄUSCHVOLLER UMGEBUNG

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE PRISE DE SON ET D'ECOUTE POUR EQUIPEMENT DE TETE EN AMBIANCE BRUITEE

Publication

EP 0818121 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97900642 A

Priority

  • FR 9700061 W
  • FR 9600935 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9727723A1] A sound pick-up and reproduction system for a headset in a noisy environment, comprising, on the sound pick-up side, at least one microphone (20) followed by a sampling device (25), a decimation unit (26) and a device (27) for compensating signal deformation occurring in the upstream sound chain, and, on the reproduction side, an interpolator (5) followed by a device (6) for compensating the operator's hearing deficiencies, and an active noise reduction loop (10, 11, 7, 12, 13, 14).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04R 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04R 3/00 (2006.01); G10K 11/178 (2006.01); H04R 3/04 (2006.01); H04R 25/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04R 3/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9727723 A1 19970731; CA 2214094 A1 19970731; DE 69715110 D1 20021010; DE 69715110 T2 20030515; EP 0818121 A1 19980114; EP 0818121 B1 20020904; FR 2744320 A1 19970801; FR 2744320 B1 19980306; IL 121473 A 20001031; IL 121473 D0 19980208; JP H11502692 A 19990302; NO 974418 A 19971121; NO 974418 D0 19970924; US 6058194 A 20000502

INPADOC legal status


2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100114

2010-10-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100801

2010-09-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100114

2010-08-18 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100801

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090114

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-05-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20090104

- Year of fee payment: 13

2003-08-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030605

2003-08-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030801

2002-12-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021123

2002-10-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69715110 20021010

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB NL

2002-09-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-01-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011220

2001-05-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: THALES AVIONICS S.A.

1999-11-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: THOMSON-CSF SEXTANT

1998-01-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970922

1998-01-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB NL