Global Patent Index - EP 0818163 B1

EP 0818163 B1 2002-11-20 - Drawer guide

Title (en)

Drawer guide

Title (de)

Schubladenführung

Title (fr)

Coulisse de tiroir

Publication

EP 0818163 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97890108 A

Priority

AT 120996 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0818163A2] The drawer guide has a fixed guide (1) attached to the sides of the drawer recess by spaced out support yokes (2). Hanging or push-fit connections (6,13) are provided for the guide rail and support yokes so that the guide rail can be hung in or pushed in sockets (6,9) formed out of the support yokes by tabs (13) provided on the outside of the guide rail and formed out of the material of same. At least one connection has a self-locking fall-out safeguard (7). This safeguard can be a protruding knob or similar which when the plate or tab (13) is pushed in engages in an opening (15) on the rail. The connection can be a hanging connection where the tab on the rail points down with its insert end across the rail and hangs from above over the web (6) of the support yoke mounted in the longitudinal direction of the rail,.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47B 88/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 88/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 88/43 (2017.01)

Citation (examination)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0818163 A2 19980114; EP 0818163 A3 19980805; EP 0818163 B1 20021120; EP 0818163 B2 20051102; AT 411005 B 20030925; AT A120996 A 20020315; DE 59708749 D1 20030102; ES 2187747 T3 20030616; ES 2187747 T5 20060516; US 5890784 A 19990406

INPADOC legal status


2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100620

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110705

2011-07-15 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110715

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110101

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100619

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090629

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090629

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20090601

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-05-16 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T5

2005-11-02 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20051102

2005-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT

2003-10-15 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: HAEFELE GMBH & CO.

- Effective date: 20030819

2003-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2187747 T3

2003-01-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59708749 20030102

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT

2002-06-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011221

1999-04-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES IT

1999-04-21 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT

1998-11-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980909

1998-08-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-08-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI

1998-01-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT

1998-01-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI