Global Patent Index - EP 0818390 B1

EP 0818390 B1 2000-12-20 - Apparatus for sterilising webs of packaging material

Title (en)

Apparatus for sterilising webs of packaging material

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Entkeimen und/oder Sterilisieren von Packstoffbahnen

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour stériliser des bandes en matériau d'emballage

Publication

EP 0818390 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97111225 A

Priority

DE 19627119 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0818390A1] The device uses a barrier discharge acting on the side of the packaging web (PB) which faces the packaged food, provided by a discharge tube (1) through which a fluid medium is passed and a cooperating counter-electrode. The latter is provided by a support surface (2) with a sensor-controlled device (3) for holding it at the required temperature for the packaging web. The temperature of the fluid medium fed through the discharge tube is detected for controlling a heating device (5) holding the discharge tube at above the dew point temperature.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 55/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 55/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 55/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE DK ES FR GB IE LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0818390 A1 19980114; EP 0818390 B1 20001220; AT 198180 T 20010115; DE 19627119 A1 19980115; ES 2152599 T3 20010201

INPADOC legal status


2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100202

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080614

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060731

2008-01-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060704

2007-10-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20060704

2007-05-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070330

2006-03-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050703

2005-07-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050728

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-07-03 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050703

2005-06-24 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20050624

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040630

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-11-14 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2001-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010731

2001-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010731

2001-07-03 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010703

2001-03-20 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010320

2001-03-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-02-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2152599 T3

2001-01-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59702777 20010125

2001-01-24 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2001-01-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20001220

2000-12-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK ES FR GB IE LI

2000-12-20 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001220

2000-12-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 198180 T 20010115

1999-04-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990223

1999-03-24 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK ES FR GB IE LI

1998-09-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK LI

1998-09-23 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK LI

1998-09-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980714

1998-01-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK ES FR GB IE LI