Global Patent Index - EP 0818410 B1

EP 0818410 B1 2002-11-27 - Cleaning device for an auto-winder

Title (en)

Cleaning device for an auto-winder

Title (de)

Reinigungsvorrichtung für eine automatische Aufspulmaschine

Title (fr)

Dispositif de nettoyage pour un bobinoir automatique

Publication

EP 0818410 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97109881 A

Priority

JP 19827696 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0818410A2] A cleaning device for an auto-winder arranged with a cleaning air blowing hole and a cleaning air suction hole on each winding unit of the auto-winder and where fly waste is not dispersed out of the auto-winder due to the production of a flow of cleaning air that circulates inside the auto-winder of each winding unit. Furthermore, cleaning air is blown from the blowing hole towards the winding unit. Then the cleaning air blown from the blowing hole is sucked into the suction hole and returned once again to the blowing hole.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 54/70

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 54/70 (2006.01); B65H 54/88 (2006.01); D01H 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 54/702 (2013.01); B65H 2701/31 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0818410 A2 19980114; EP 0818410 A3 19980422; EP 0818410 B1 20021127; CN 1169947 A 19980114; DE 69717355 D1 20030109; DE 69717355 T2 20030904; JP 2973933 B2 19991108; JP H1025059 A 19980127

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080617

2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090101

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070627

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-07-02 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070702

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-11-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030828

2003-01-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69717355 20030109

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE IT

2000-07-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000602

2000-06-08 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

1999-01-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE IT

1999-01-07 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE IT

1998-07-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980529

1998-04-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-04-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI

1998-01-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE IT

1998-01-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI