Global Patent Index - EP 0818568 A3

EP 0818568 A3 2000-05-03 - Method and apparatus for hydrodynamically entangling the fibres of a web

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for hydrodynamically entangling the fibres of a web

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum hydrodynamischen Verschlingen der Fasern einer Faserbahn

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour l'entrelacement hydrodynamique de fibres d'une nappe fibreuse

Publication

EP 0818568 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 96115337 A

Priority

DE 19627256 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0818568A2] A process for hydrodynamically entangling fibres in a web to consolidate them, preferably without using binders and the fibres being any kind of natural or synthetic fibre, entails tangling them together by application of high pressure fluid jets, inter-entanglement of the web's upper and lower sides being optimally achieved by not only a large number of water jets in series but also by leading the web in a meandering path and applying the jets several times to alternate sides. The web is driven and supported uninterrupted by a shape interlock without stretching while it is being conveyed under the impinging jets and when the side being processed is changed. Also claimed is the apparatus including nozzle beams (6, 7, 13, 15, 20, 22) in series, extending over the web breadth and from which jets are directed at the web (2) alternately on each of its sides.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D04H 1/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D04H 1/46 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04H 18/04 (2013.01); D04H 1/46 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0818568 A2 19980114; EP 0818568 A3 20000503; EP 0818568 B1 20040428; DE 19627256 A1 19980115; JP 3677126 B2 20050727; JP H1025649 A 19980127; US 5761778 A 19980609

INPADOC legal status


2011-09-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20091006

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110401

2011-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100930

2011-07-21 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59611001

- Effective date: 20110401

2011-06-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110531

2011-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100925

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090921

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20091021

- Year of fee payment: 14

2005-04-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050131

2005-01-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-10-27 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20040428

2004-08-25 [REG GB ERR] ERRATUM

- Free text: NOTIFICATION HAS NOW BEEN RECEIVED FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT OFFICE THAT THE CORRECT NAME OF THE PROPRIETOR IS: FLEISSNER GMBH THIS CORRECTION WAS PUBLISHED IN THE EUROPEAN PATENT BULLETIN 04/19 OF 20040506.

2004-06-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59611001 P 20040603

2004-05-19 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: FLEISSNER GMBH

2004-04-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-04-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-04-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040428

2002-08-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020619

2001-01-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2000-05-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000328

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1998-01-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT