Global patent index - EP 0818578 B1

EP 0818578 B1 2000-10-25 - Cover for a manhole

Title (en)

Cover for a manhole

Title (de)

Abdeckung für eine Bodenöffnung

Title (fr)

Couvercle pour regard

Publication

EP 0818578 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97810155 A

Priority

CH 175196 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0818578A1] The cover (2) is supported in a frame (1). A support surface (22) on the outer circumference of the cover and a contact face (11) on the frame are mainly formed by jacket sections of a straight cylinder, which are defined by two imaginary non-parallel cutting planes (31,32). The upper imaginary cutting plane extends parallel to the top face of the cover, or contains it. The lower plane is at right angles to the cylinder jacket lines. The two planes cut across each other at an angle of between 1 and 15 degrees .

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E02D 29/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E02D 29/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E02D 29/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0818578 A1 19980114; EP 0818578 B1 20001025; AT 197182 T 20001115; DE 59702520 D1 20001130

INPADOC legal status

2016-04-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160322

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-07-15 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PCAR

- Free Format Text: NEW ADDRESS: HOLBEINSTRASSE 36-38, 4051 BASEL (CH)

2008-06-25 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: VONROLL INFRATEC (INVESTMENT) AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2007-09-14 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: VONROLL HYDROTEC SA

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2007-09-14 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: VONROLL INFRATEC (INVESTMENT) AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: PUE

2005-01-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2004-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-11-10 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20040317

2004-10-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041001

2004-03-17 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040317

2004-03-17 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040317

2003-11-28 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2003-06-04 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2003-05-30 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: VON ROLL INFRANET SA

- Ref Legal Event Code: PUE

2003-05-27 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030527

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-03-13 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030313

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-03-11 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030311

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-02-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030219

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-10-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-12-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-12-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: A. BRAUN, BRAUN, HERITIER, ESCHMANN AG PATENTANWAE

2000-11-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59702520

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-11-30

2000-11-15 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20001025

2000-10-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB LI

2000-10-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 197182

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-11-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2000-04-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000216

1998-09-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT CH DE FR GB LI

1998-09-23 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB LI

1998-08-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980602

1998-01-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB LI